Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0597881

EP0597881 - HEATED CATHETER FOR MONITORING CARDIAC OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2003Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 12.03.2003  [2003/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
1212 Terra Bella Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[1995/32]
Former [1994/21]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
1212 Terra Bella Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HUGHES, Timothy, J.
2020 Louis Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[1994/21]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/21]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date92914564.712.06.1992
[1994/21]
WO1992US05038
Priority number, dateUS1991071754919.06.1991         Original published format: US 717549
[1994/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9222240
Date:23.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0597881
Date:25.05.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992
[1994/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0597881
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0597881
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.12.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/028
[1995/29]
Former International [1994/21]A61B5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/21]
TitleGerman:HEIZBARER KATHETER ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES HERZMINUTENVOLUMENS[1994/21]
English:HEATED CATHETER FOR MONITORING CARDIAC OUTPUT[1994/21]
French:CATHETER CHAUFFE DE CONTROLE DU DEBIT CARDIAQUE[1994/21]
Entry into regional phase08.01.1994National basic fee paid 
08.01.1994Search fee paid 
08.01.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
08.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/21]
17.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.1998Observations by third parties
06.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.07.1998Observations by third parties
21.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Fee for grant paid
06.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP99116854.3  / EP0962187
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.10.2000  12.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences LLC
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2000/48]
Opponent(s)01  04.10.2000  12.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Edwards Lifesciences LLC
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
07.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.03.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.04.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
07.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2001Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.10.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.12.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0182363  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 17 - page 10, line 7 * [Y] 8,10-14;
 [XY]EP0235811  (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 10 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 13 * * page 15, line 14 - line 26 * [Y] 8,10-14;
 [AX]US4819655  (WEBLER WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 17 * [X] 8-10;
 [A]US3075515  (RICHARDS ALBERT M) [A] 1,2,8,10,11 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 41 *;
 [AY]US4236527  (NEWBOWER RONALD S, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 9 * * column 5, line 11 - column 68 * [Y] 8,10-14
International search[Y]US4450719
 [A]US4627279
 [A]US3438253
 [A]US4537068
 [AP]US5072612
 [AP]WO9117703
 [A]US4217910
 [Y]  MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING, Vol. 11, March 1973, DELAUNOIS, "Thermal Method for Continuous Blood-Velocity Measurements in Large Blood Vessels and Cardiac-Output Determination"
otherUS3359974
 US4217910
OppositionUS4240441
    - "IEEE Transactions on Biomedical Engineering VOL BME 31, No. 5, May 1984, "Continuous Thermal Measurement of Cardiac Output", Philip et al,