Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0591432

EP0591432 - SOLUBILITY PARAMETER BASED DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALTERING DRUG SATURATION CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  08.10.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2010Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 10.11.2010  [2010/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NOVEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
11960 S.W. 144th Street
Miami, FL 33186 / US
[1997/02]
Former [1994/15]For all designated states
NOVEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
13300 S.W. 128th Street
Miami, FL 33186 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MIRANDA, Jesus
14819 S.W. 140th Court
Miami, FL 33186 / US
02 / SABLOTSKY, Steven
9245 S.W. 118th Terrace
Miami, FL 33176 / US
[1994/15]
Representative(s)Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/39]Stilkenböhmer, Uwe Michael
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2005/39]TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2004/10]Klusmann, Peter, Dr. , et al
Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [1994/15]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Deichmannhaus (Bahnhofsvorplatz)
D-50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date92914856.722.06.1992
[1994/15]
WO1992US05297
Priority number, dateUS1991072234227.06.1991         Original published format: US 722342
[1994/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9300058
Date:07.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0591432
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993
[1994/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0591432
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0591432
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.01.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/02, A61F13/00, A61L15/16, A01N37/00, A61K9/70
[1995/19]
Former International [1994/15]A61F13/02, A61F13/00, A61L15/16, A01N37/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/15]
TitleGerman:AUF EINEM LÖSLICHKEITSPARAMETER BASIERENDES MEDIKAMENTENABGABESYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER SÄTTIGUNGSKONZENTRATION EINES MEDIKAMENTS[1994/15]
English:SOLUBILITY PARAMETER BASED DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ALTERING DRUG SATURATION CONCENTRATION[1994/15]
French:SYSTEME D'APPORT DE MEDICAMENTS FONDE SUR UN PARAMETRE DE SOLUBILITE ET PROCEDE MODIFIANT LA CONCENTRATION DE SATURATION D'UN MEDICAMENT[1994/15]
Entry into regional phase22.01.1994National basic fee paid 
22.01.1994Search fee paid 
22.01.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
22.01.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.01.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
22.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/15]
28.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2002Fee for grant paid
18.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.06.2003  21.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
408 Tashirodaikan-machi
Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hammer, Jens
Grünecker Kinkeldey
Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2004/29]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2003  21.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
408 Tashirodaikan-machi
Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hammer, Jens
Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/31]
Opponent(s)01  02.06.2003  21.07.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
408 Tashirodaikan-machi
Tosu-shi Saga 841-0017 / JP
Opponent's representative
Hammer, Jens (DE)
Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
25.07.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.04.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.12.2009Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
25.01.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.01.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.05.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
27.08.2010Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC30.06.2003
[2005/02]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8703477  (FLEXCON CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0312265  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1 * claim - *
International search[Y]US4906169
OppositionJPH02124891
 JPH03127726
 JPH03127727
 WO9007940