Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0653969

EP0653969 - A MOULDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Papervision Limited
Equity Court, 73-75 Millbrook Road East
Southampton, Hampshire SO15 1RJ / GB
[1999/37]
Former [1995/21]For all designated states
HI-TEC METALS LIMITED
Unit B4 Millbrook Close
Chandlers Ford, Southampton S053 4BZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CHADWICK, Geoffrey A. 12 St. Giles Cose
St. Giless Hill
Winchester S023 8JJ / GB
[1995/21]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/29]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Former [1995/21]Shackleton, Nicola , et al
Boult, Wade & Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date92915726.123.07.1992
[1995/21]
WO1992GB01350
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9402271
Date:03.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0653969
Date:24.05.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994
[1995/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0653969
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:B22D17/08
[1995/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1996/20]
Former [1995/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:EINE GIESSVORRICHTUNG[1995/21]
English:A MOULDING DEVICE[1995/21]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE[1995/21]
Entry into regional phase20.01.1995National basic fee paid 
20.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
20.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/21]
28.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.1998Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
12.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.1999Fee for grant paid
21.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Request for further processing for:25.01.1999Request for further processing filed
25.01.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.02.1999Decision despatched
16.12.1997Request for further processing filed
16.12.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
05.01.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199504   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.1995
31.07.199605   M06   Fee paid on   26.08.1996
31.07.199706   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1997
31.07.199807   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.1999
31.07.199908   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2000
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
LU23.07.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
GR03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2003/45]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
MC31.07.2000
DK03.08.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2003/07]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
NL03.05.2000
MC31.07.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2002/42]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
MC31.07.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2002/25]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
ES03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/27]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
SE03.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT03.05.2000
BE03.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2129343
 [X]EP0095513
 [X]US2669760
 [X]GB310261
 [X]  Patent Abstracts of Japan, Vol 6, No 267, M-182,, abstract of JP, 57-159251 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.),