Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0550770

EP0550770 - METHOD OF PRODUCING VERTICAL MOSFETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/28]METHOD OF PRODUCING VERTICAL MOSFET
[1997/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.09.1998
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City
Aichi-Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/33]For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-City, Aichi-Pref. / JP
Former [1993/28]For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TOKURA, Norihito Nippondenso Co., Ltd.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Shigeki Nippondenso Co., Ltd.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448 / JP
[1993/28]
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Former [1993/28]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date92916224.622.07.1992
[1993/28]
WO1992JP00929
Priority number, dateJP1991018760226.07.1991         Original published format: JP 18760291
[1993/28]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9303502
Date:18.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0550770
Date:14.07.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1993
[1993/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0550770
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.02.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/772, H01L29/41
[1997/46]
Former International [1993/32]H01L29/784, H01L29/60
Former International [1993/28]H01L29/784
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VERTIKALER MOSFETS[1997/46]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING VERTICAL MOSFETS[1997/46]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS A EFFET DE CHAMP MOS DE TYPE VERTICAL[1993/28]
Former [1993/28]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSZELLUNG VERTIKALER MOSFET
Former [1993/28]METHOD OF PRODUCING VERTICAL MOSFET
Entry into regional phase25.03.1993Translation filed 
25.03.1993National basic fee paid 
25.03.1993Search fee paid 
25.03.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.1993Examination requested  [1993/28]
09.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.05.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1997Fee for grant paid
26.08.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.08.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]JP62012167  ;
 [A]JP63094687  ;
 [X]DE3427293  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]);
 [A]US4992390  (CHANG HSUEH-RONG [US]);
 [A]EP0345380  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]);
 [A]FR2513016  (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]);
 [A]US4148047  (HENDRICKSON THOMAS E)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 179 (E-514)9 June 1987 & JP-A-62 012 167 ( TDK CORP ) 21 January 1987, & JP62012167 A 19870121
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 330 (E-655)(3177) 7 September 1988 & JP-A-63 094 687 ( OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) 25 April 1988, & JP63094687 A 19880425
 [A]  - S.M.SZE 'VLSI Technology' 1988 , MCGRAW-HILL BOOK CO - SINGAPORE , SINGAPORE
International searchJPS6212167  [ ] (TDK CORP);
 JPS6028271  [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR);
 JPS6246569  [ ] (TDK CORP);
 JPS5491187  [ ] (TEKTRONIX INC);
 JPS5696865  [ ] (FUJITSU LTD);
 JPH01192174  [ ] (HITACHI LTD);
 JPS56150870  [ ] (RCA CORP);
 JPS54146584  [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 JPS63266882  [ ] (HITACHI LTD);
 JPH0286136  [ ] (HITACHI LTD);
 JPH0286171  [ ] (HITACHI LTD);
 JPS598374  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP);
 JPS5316581  [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO);
 JPS58166759  [ ] (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO);
 JPH02262375  [ ] (TOSHIBA CORP);
 JPH01189172  [ ] (SHARP KK);
 JPS598375  [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP)
 [A]  - Journal of Electrochemical Society: Solid-State Science and Technology, Vol. 124, No. 2, February 1977, H. SAKAI et al. "Methods to Improve the Surface Planarity of Locally Oxidized Silicon Devices", pages 318-320.
 [A]  - IEEE Transactions on Electron Devices, Vol. ED-32, No. 1, January 1985 (New York), D. UEDA et al. "A New Vertical Power MOSFET Structure with Extremely Reduced On-Resistance", pages 2-6.
ExaminationJPS598374
 JPS598375