EP0596972 - NON-BITUMINOUS SOUND DEADENING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRI-TEX AUSTRALIA PTY LTD 29-33 Plateau Road Reservoir, VIC 3073 / AU | [1994/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Graeme, Matthew 29-33 Plateau Road Reservoir, VIC 3073 / AU | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead, Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Brown, David Leslie, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92916406.9 | 23.07.1992 | [1994/20] | WO1992AU00375 | Priority number, date | AU19910007351 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: AU 735191 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9302021 | Date: | 04.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596972 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0596972 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.02.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C04B26/02, C04B26/04, C04B26/08, C04B14/28, C04B24/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/34, C08K3/26, C08K5/09, E04B1/86, E04B1/84 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/082 (US);
B32B15/085 (US);
B32B27/20 (US);
C04B26/04 (EP,US);
B32B2307/10 (US);
C04B2111/00525 (EP,US);
C04B2111/52 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31688 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B26/04, C04B14/04, C04B14/26, C04B24/085, C04B24/34, C04B24/36, C04B40/0028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | NICHT-BITUMINÖSES SCHALLDÄMPFENDES MATERIAL | [1994/20] | English: | NON-BITUMINOUS SOUND DEADENING MATERIAL | [1994/20] | French: | MATERIAU D'INSONORISATION NON BITUMINEUX | [1994/20] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Request for further processing for: | 05.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2000 | BE | 08.03.2000 | CH | 08.03.2000 | ES | 08.03.2000 | GR | 08.03.2000 | LI | 08.03.2000 | NL | 08.03.2000 | SE | 08.03.2000 | DK | 08.06.2000 | LU | 23.07.2000 | MC | 31.07.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
GR | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
DK | 08.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
DK | 08.06.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
MC | 31.07.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 08.03.2000 | |
BE | 08.03.2000 | ||
CH | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59179538 ; | [A]JPS5430708B ; | [A]JPS5233935 ; | [A]JPH01241422 ; | [A]JPS5413589 ; | [A]US3909488 (CONSOLI SEBASTIAN A) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850215), vol. 009, no. 036, Database accession no. (C - 266), & JP59179538 A 19841012 (MARUKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 43, Database accession no. 79-78489B, & JP54030708B B 19791002 (HAYAKAWA GUM KK) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 17, Database accession no. 77-29858Y, & JPS5233935 A 19770315 (NIPPON ZEON KK) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 44, Database accession no. 89-321731, & JPH01241422 A 19890926 (MITSUI DEPONT POLYC) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 10, Database accession no. 79-19246B, & JPS5413589 A 19790201 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [A] 1,9,15,19,23 * abstract * | International search | [XA]NL8400713 ; | [A]AU2738963 ; | [A]JPS61209279 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH03273296 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) | [XA] - DERWENT ABSTRACT Accession No. N85-204580, Class Q41; & NL,A,8400713 (KRINKELS BEPILANTING) 6 March 1984 (06.03.84), see Abstract., & NL8400713 A 00000000 |