Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0548356 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0548356



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2395
21.01.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
25.06.2013 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.05.2013 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 33
29.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.04.2013 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.04.2013 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 36
16.04.2013 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
12.12.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 18
09.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
09.11.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
06.11.2012 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 6
05.11.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 21
29.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.10.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 3
16.10.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 1
15.10.2012 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 10
15.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 10
15.10.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
11.10.2012 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
04.10.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 25
04.10.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.09.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.09.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.09.2012 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
07.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.09.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
05.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.09.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.08.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
02.08.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
24.07.2012 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
19.07.2012 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
05.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
04.04.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.04.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
31.03.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.03.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
29.03.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 20
23.03.2012 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.11.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
04.10.2011 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
10.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
04.02.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
30.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
23.01.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
23.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 2
23.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 22
23.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
17.12.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 6
15.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
11.12.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
08.12.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 48
04.12.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 48
02.12.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2008 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 6
25.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.09.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.09.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.05.2008 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 6
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Claims Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 14
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
21.05.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
19.05.2008 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 49
17.04.2008 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.03.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.03.2008 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 7
07.03.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
03.03.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.03.2008 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
29.02.2008 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.02.2008 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
28.02.2008 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2008 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
17.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.01.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.01.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
10.01.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
10.01.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
10.01.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
10.01.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 2
10.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.01.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
10.01.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.12.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.11.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2007 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.11.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.10.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 4
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 2
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 2
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 3
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 4
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Claims Opposition 1
22.10.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.10.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
18.10.2007 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 38
16.10.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.06.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.06.2007 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
08.06.2007 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
25.05.2007 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.09.2006 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
12.01.2006 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
20.12.2005 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
18.11.2005 Request for change of name Opposition 40
17.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
18.04.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 24
13.04.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
16.03.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
02.03.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 5
01.03.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.02.2005 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 6
21.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 2
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 2
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 3
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
10.02.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
10.02.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
09.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 2
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 3
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 2
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Claims Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 6
07.02.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Appeal 1
07.02.2005 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Appeal 21
04.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.02.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
21.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.01.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.10.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
05.11.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.05.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 6
12.05.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
05.04.2003 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 8
17.12.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
07.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.11.2001 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 6
24.10.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
04.10.2001 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
01.06.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 6
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.05.2001 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.05.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
02.04.2001 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.03.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 6
29.03.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
22.03.2001 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.03.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.01.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.01.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.01.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
22.01.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
22.01.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
22.01.2001 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 4
22.01.2001 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
22.01.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
22.01.2001 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.11.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.11.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
20.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.11.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 4
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 2
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 3
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Claims Opposition 1
30.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
27.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 13
26.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 16
20.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
06.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.10.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.09.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
27.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
27.09.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
14.03.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.03.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.03.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
25.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.02.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.02.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
21.02.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
21.02.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.02.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.01.2000 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
26.01.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.12.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.12.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
16.11.1999 N/A Opposition 1
06.11.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.11.1999 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
02.11.1999 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 16
24.09.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.09.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.09.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.09.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.07.1999 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.07.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.07.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
02.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.03.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
02.03.1999 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.10.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.09.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 8
22.09.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
22.09.1998 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
24.08.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
24.08.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.08.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.06.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.06.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.05.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.05.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.05.1998 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.01.1998 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.01.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
07.01.1998 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
07.01.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.12.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.12.1997 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.12.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.12.1997 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
14.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
14.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
11.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
07.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
07.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
07.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
07.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
07.11.1997 N/A Opposition 1
04.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.11.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
04.11.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
04.11.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 20
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.11.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.11.1997 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
31.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
31.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
31.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
31.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
31.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
31.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
30.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
30.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
30.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
30.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
29.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 12
29.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
29.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
29.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
28.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
28.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 24
28.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
28.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
28.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
28.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
28.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
25.10.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
25.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
25.10.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.10.1997 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
25.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.10.1997 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
19.12.1996 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.10.1996 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.10.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.10.1996 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.08.1996 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
25.07.1996 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.04.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
24.04.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
15.03.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
15.02.1996 Claims Search / examination 1
15.02.1996 Description Search / examination 1
15.02.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.1996 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
06.12.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.09.1995 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.09.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
06.09.1995 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.09.1995 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
17.07.1995 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.04.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.04.1995 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.1994 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
14.02.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
07.02.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
27.05.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.05.1993 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.03.1993 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.03.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.03.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.02.1993 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
04.02.1993 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 18
04.02.1993 Priority document Search / examination 18
02.09.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1