blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0599940

EP0599940 - NEEDLELESS INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.1998
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.1998 [1998/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WESTON MEDICAL LIMITED
2a Hales Barn Workshops, New Street Stradbroke, Eye
Suffolk IP21 5JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]For all designated states
WESTON MEDICAL LIMITED
2a Hales Barn Workshops, New Street
Stradbroke, Eye, Suffolk IP21 5JG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WESTON, Terence Edward
Thornlea, Pixey Green, Stradbroke
Eye, Suffolk IP21 5NG / GB
[1994/23]
Representative(s)Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/23]Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date92917735.021.08.1992
[1994/23]
WO1992GB01539
Priority number, dateGB1991001820423.08.1991         Original published format: GB 9118204
[1997/52]
Former [1994/23]GB1991018204823.08.1991
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9303779
Date:04.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0599940
Date:08.06.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0599940
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/30
[1994/23]
CPC:
G01N33/543 (EP,US); A61M5/20 (EP,US); A61M5/30 (EP,US);
G01N33/54313 (EP,US); G01N33/5436 (EP,US); G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
A01G7/06 (EP); A61M5/204 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1994/23]
TitleGerman:NADELLOSER INJEKTOR[1994/23]
English:NEEDLELESS INJECTOR[1994/23]
French:INJECTEUR SANS AIGUILLE[1994/23]
Entry into regional phase25.02.1994National basic fee paid 
25.02.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.03.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
04.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/23]
29.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1997Fee for grant paid
03.09.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:all designated states
Date:23.12.1996
[1997/13]
Former [1994/50]ID:01
For:all designated states
Date:10.10.1994
[1997/13]
Cited inInternational search[A]FR1049564  (NORMECA);
 [X]US3330276  (GORDON JOHN R);
 [X]US4059107  (IRIGUCHI NORIO, et al);
 [X]US4089334  (SCHWEBEL PAUL R, et al);
 [X]US4722728  (DIXON ALAN J [CA])
ExaminationUS2398544
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.