Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0598843

EP0598843 - ARAMID PARTICLES AS WEAR ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.07.2000
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOINESS, David, Eldon
60 Jeremiah Collett Road
Glen Mills, PA 19342 / US
[1994/22]
Representative(s)Abitz, Walter , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/22]Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date92918860.520.08.1992
[1994/22]
WO1992US06802
Priority number, dateUS1991075294320.08.1991         Original published format: US 752943
[1994/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9304300
Date:04.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0598843
Date:01.06.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993
[1994/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0598843
Date:20.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/12]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0598843
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Search report(s)International search reportEP04.03.1993
ClassificationInternational:F16D69/02, C09K3/10, C08J5/14
[1994/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/22]
TitleGerman:ARAMID-PARTIKEL ALS VERSCHLEISSZUSÄTZE[1994/22]
English:ARAMID PARTICLES AS WEAR ADDITIVES[1994/22]
French:PARTICULES D'ARAMIDE SERVANT D'ADDITIFS ANTI-USURE[1994/22]
Entry into regional phase14.02.1994National basic fee paid 
14.02.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.02.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/22]
09.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.1995Fee for grant paid
27.12.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.12.1996  13.01.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Patent Department, Velperweg 76, P.O.Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Kraak, Hajo
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Patent Department
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2009/27]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.1996  13.01.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Patent Department, Velperweg 76, P.O.Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Kraak, Hajo
Akzo Nobel N.V. Patent Department P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Former [1997/09]
Opponent(s)01  20.12.1996   
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Patent Department, Velperweg 76, P.O.Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Kraak, Hajo (NL)
Patent Department Pharma N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20 Weth. Van Eschstraat 1
NL-5340 BH Oss / NL
23.01.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.08.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.01.1998Date of oral proceedings
26.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.02.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.03.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.12.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.03.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
14.06.2000Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition20.05.1998Appeal received No.  T0521/98
10.07.1998Statement of grounds filed
14.12.1999Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
14.12.1999Date of oral proceedings
23.12.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3637022
 [Y]FR2532243
 [Y]FR2532385
 [Y]EP0034258
 [Y]EP0074838
 [A]DE3735634