Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0558727

EP0558727 - BONE-GROWTH-STIMULATING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baylink, David Jeston, Prof. Dr.
Loma Linda University, Jerry L. Pattis Veterans Hosp. 11201 Benton Street
Loma Linda CA 92357 / US
For all designated states
Ewers, Rolf, Prof. Dr. Dr.
Liebhartstalstrasse 28
A-1160 Wien / AT
For all designated states
Kirsch, Axel, Dr.
Talstrasse 23
70794 Filderstadt / DE
[2000/05]
Former [1993/36]For all designated states
Baylink, David Jeston
Loma Linda University, Jerry L. Pattis Veterans Hosp. 11201 Benton Street
Loma Linda CA 92357 / US
For all designated states
Ewers, Rolf, Prof. Dr. Dr.
Liebhartstalstrasse 28
A-1160 Wien / AT
For all designated states
Kirsch, Axel, Dr.
Talstrasse 23
D-70794 Filderstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1993/36]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/36]Goddar, Heinz J., Dr.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date92919963.609.09.1992
[1993/36]
WO1992DE00778
Priority number, dateDE1991413054513.09.1991         Original published format: DE 4130545
[1993/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9305808
Date:01.04.1993
Language:DE
[1993/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0558727
Date:08.09.1993
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993
[1993/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0558727
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61L24/00, A61K38/00, A61K38/27
[2000/04]
Former International [1998/50]A61L25/00, A61K38/00, A61K38/27
Former International [1993/36]A61L25/00, A61K37/02, A61K37/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1993/36]
TitleGerman:KNOCHENWACHSTUMSFÖRDERNDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1993/36]
English:BONE-GROWTH-STIMULATING COMPOSITION[1993/36]
French:COMPOSITION STIMULANT LA CROISSANCE OSSEUSE[1993/36]
Entry into regional phase10.05.1993National basic fee paid 
10.05.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/36]
11.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.1999Fee for grant paid
25.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199807   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1999
30.09.199908   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES02.02.2000
GB02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
LU09.09.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]ES02.02.2000
GB02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/45]ES02.02.2000
GB02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/42]ES02.02.2000
GB02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2002/25]ES02.02.2000
GB02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/13]GB02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
CH30.09.2000
LI30.09.2000
Former [2002/02]GB02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
BE30.09.2000
Former [2001/50]GB02.02.2000
IE02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/12]GB02.02.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]SE02.05.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9004974
 [X]EP0322249
 [XP]US5118667