Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0642666

EP0642666 - HEPATITIS C ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AT
published on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
One Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LESNIEWSKI, Richard, R.
8706 110th Avenue
Kenosha, WI 53142 / US
02 / LEUNG, Tat, K.
P.O.Box 9033
Seattle, Washington 98109 / US
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/11]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date92920853.616.09.1992
[1995/11]
WO1992US07813
Priority number, dateUS1991076029216.09.1991         Original published format: US 760292
[1995/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9306247
Date:01.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0642666
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0642666
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0642666
Date:11.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/576, C07K14/18
[1999/26]
Former International [1995/11]G01N33/576, C07K7/10, C07K15/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1995/11]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON HEPATITIS C[1995/11]
English:HEPATITIS C ASSAY[1995/11]
French:ANALYSE DE DETECTION DE L'HEPATITE C[1995/11]
Entry into regional phase24.03.1994National basic fee paid 
24.03.1994Search fee paid 
24.03.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
24.03.1994Examination requested  [1995/11]
06.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.1999Fee for grant paid
10.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.01.2001  05.02.2001  ADMISSIBLE
Innogenetics N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 Box 4
B-9052 Gent / BE
Opponent's representative
De Clercq, Ann G. Y.
De Clercq & Partners cvba Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/11]
Opponent(s)01  12.01.2001   
Innogenetics N.V.
Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 Box 4
B-9052 Gent / BE
Opponent's representative
De Clercq, Ann
De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a
9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE
28.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.07.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
17.04.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.06.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.10.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.10.2002Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.03.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.05.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:24.09.1997Request for further processing filed
24.09.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.10.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
06.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
[2006/33]
Former [2006/24]AT12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2005/13]AT12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2004/07]GR12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2003/45]DK12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2001/26]SE12.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0445423  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 4, line 15 - line 17; examples 1-5; claims 8,11 *
International search[Y]EP0419182
 [Y]GB2099578
 [Y]  Science, Volume 244, issued 21 April 1989, G. KUO et al., "An Assay for Circulating Antibodies to a Major Etiologic Virus of Human Non-A, Non-B Hepatitis", pages 262-264, entire document
 [Y]  Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, Volume 175, No. 1, issued 28 February 1991, M. HIJIKATA et al., "Hypervariable Regions in the Putative Glycoprotein of Hepatitis C Virus", pages 220-228, especially page 224
 [Y]  Journal of General Virology, Volume 72, issued 1991, D. KREMSDORF et al., "Parital Nucleotide Sequence Analysis of a French Hepatitis C Virus: Implications for HCV Genetic Variability", pages 2557-2561, especially page 2559, Figure 2(b)
OppositionEP0388232
    - Takeuchi et al. Nucleic Acids Research 1990, 18 :4626,
    - Kato et al. Proc Natl Acad Sci USA 1990, 87 : 9524,
    - J Expt Med, vol 60 no 3 1990, pp 167-177,