blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0605632 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0605632



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 855
06.09.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
25.07.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
25.07.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.07.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
06.07.2007 French translation of claims Opposition 3
06.07.2007 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
06.07.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.04.2007 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
10.04.2007 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
10.04.2007 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
02.04.2007 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 2
09.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.10.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 2
23.10.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
23.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.10.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 30
18.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Description Opposition 2
12.05.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
25.04.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
07.12.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 24
19.09.2005 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
06.09.2005 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 6
11.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.08.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
13.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
13.07.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.07.2005 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
04.07.2005 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
01.07.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.07.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.06.2005 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.06.2005 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 3
25.06.2005 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
24.06.2005 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
23.06.2005 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
21.06.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.06.2005 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
13.06.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.06.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
08.06.2005 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 2
07.06.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.06.2005 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
27.05.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
20.05.2005 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.10.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
01.10.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.05.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
15.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
21.03.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
14.03.2003 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.03.2003 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.11.2002 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.11.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 26
04.11.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
04.11.2002 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
20.08.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.08.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.08.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.08.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
12.08.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.08.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.07.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.07.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.07.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
28.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 6
28.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
28.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 31
28.06.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 27
28.06.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
28.06.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
28.06.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 7
28.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.06.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.02.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
25.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
25.02.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
22.02.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.02.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
29.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.11.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
30.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
30.10.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
14.09.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.06.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.05.2001 Claims Opposition 3
30.05.2001 Claims Opposition 3
30.05.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
29.05.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
15.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
15.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
08.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.11.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
18.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
18.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
18.10.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
17.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
24.02.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.11.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 2
24.09.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
02.07.1999 Description Search / examination 2
02.07.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 3
28.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
28.06.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
30.03.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
16.11.1998 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.11.1998 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.07.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.07.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 62
06.05.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
01.10.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.09.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.09.1997 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
02.05.1997 Claims Search / examination 7
02.05.1997 Description Search / examination 29
02.05.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.02.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.01.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 7
02.05.1996 Description Search / examination 18
02.05.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.04.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
27.02.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.02.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.10.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.12.1994 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
17.11.1994 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
04.11.1994 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
09.08.1994 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.08.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.08.1994 European search report Search / examination 10
01.06.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.03.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.1994 Annex Search / examination 4
11.02.1994 Claims Search / examination 7
11.02.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.11.1993 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 7
30.11.1993 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
30.11.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
04.08.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
01.07.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
03.05.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.04.1993 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
01.04.1993 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 78
01.04.1993 Priority document Search / examination 30
03.11.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
28.06.1992 Annex to a communication Search / examination 46