blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0605632


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.07.2007 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
13.07.2007 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
06.04.2007 Change - classification published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
06.04.2007 Change - German title published on  09.05.2007  [2007/19]
04.04.2007 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
04.04.2007 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.10.2006 Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision
16.05.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition
21.04.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit
05.12.2005 New entry: Interlocutory revision of appeal
02.12.2005 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
05.10.2005 Change: Appeal number
14.09.2005 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.06.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2005 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.05.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2005 Appeal number
06.06.2003 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
07.11.2002 Change - appeal
13.08.2002 Change - appeal
25.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
25.06.2002 Change - oral proceedings
25.10.2001 Change - oral proceedings
01.06.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
17.03.2001 Change - representative published on  02.05.2001 [2001/18]
12.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
24.11.2000 Opposition filed published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
24.11.2000 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  10.01.2001 [2001/02]
17.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
17.11.2000 Examination of admissibility of opposition
17.11.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
21.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
03.12.1999 (Expected) grant published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
26.11.1999 Change - German title published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
23.09.1999 Renewal fee
07.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
26.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
26.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.11.1998 Communication of intention to grant
17.09.1998 Renewal fee
09.07.1998 Communication of intention to grant
26.06.1998 Change - French title published on  12.08.1998 [1998/33]
12.11.1997 Examination report or reply
20.09.1997 Examination report or reply
17.09.1997 Renewal fee
21.05.1997 Examination report or reply
08.02.1997 Examination report or reply
29.10.1996 Examination report or reply
21.09.1996 Renewal fee
10.05.1996 Examination report or reply
23.02.1996 Examination report or reply
13.10.1995 First examination report
01.08.1994 Supplementary search report published on  21.09.1994 [1994/38]
27.05.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.07.1994 [1994/28]
27.05.1994 Request for examination filed published on  13.07.1994 [1994/28]