blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0605632

Designated contracting states DELapse: 01.05.2002
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure28.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase11.02.1994National basic fee paid 
11.02.1994Search fee paid 
11.02.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1994Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted19.01.2000
Opposition procedure06.07.2007Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition08.08.2002APPEAL FILED
04.11.2002APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
07.12.2005APPEAL INTERLOCUTORY REVISION
07.12.2005APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:13.07.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:13.07.1994 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19940211
 
Event date:21.09.1994 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
 
Event date:21.09.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:06.12.1995 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19951019
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:24.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69230586
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000224
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:25.02.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:05.09.2000 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20000905
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:06.12.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:VP-SCHICKEDANZ AG
Effective DATE:20001017
 
Event date:10.01.2001 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:RACHELI & C
Effective DATE:20001017
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:01.05.2002 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20020501
 
Event date:09.05.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A23G 4/10 20060101AFI20070403BHEP
 
Event date:09.05.2007 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:CHEWING GUM CONTAINING INDIGESTIBLE DEXTRIN
 
Event date:22.08.2007 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20070822
 
Event date:22.08.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:04.04.2008 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20080917
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.12.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20080929
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:26.05.2010 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20090925
 
Event date:25.06.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20100531
 
Event date:30.07.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090930
 
Event date:30.11.2010 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090925