Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0605632

EP0605632 - CHEWING GUM CONTAINING INDIGESTIBLE DEXTRIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/28]CHEWING GUM AND OTHER COMESTIBLES CONTAINING INDIGESTIBLE DEXTRIN
[2007/19]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY
410 North Michigan Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60611 / US
[2007/34]
Former [1994/28]For all designated states
WM. WRIGLEY JR. COMPANY
410 North Michigan Avenue
Chicago Illinois 60611 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YATKA, Robert J.
15127 South St. Andrews Court
Orland Park, IL 60462 / US
02 / RICHEY, Lindell C.
1408 Eddy Lane
Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US
03 / MEYERS, Marc A.
1428 Baldwin
Naperville, IL 60565 / US
04 / BRODERICK, Kevin B.
1527 Wenonah
Berwyn, IL 60402 / US
05 / RECORD, David W.
1308 Lathrop Road
River Forest, IL 60305 / US
[1994/28]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [1994/28]Baverstock, Michael George Douglas , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London, EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date92921216.525.09.1992
[1994/28]
WO1992US08137
Priority number, dateWO1991US0712727.09.1991         Original published format: PCT/US91/07127
US1991080265903.12.1991         Original published format: US 802659
[1994/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9305663
Date:01.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0605632
Date:13.07.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993
[1994/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0605632
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0605632
Date:22.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.04.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1994
ClassificationInternational:A23G4/10
[2007/19]
Former International [1994/28]A23G3/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/28]
TitleGerman:KAUGUMMI WELCHER UNVERDAULICHES DEXTRIN ENTHÄLT[2007/19]
English:CHEWING GUM CONTAINING INDIGESTIBLE DEXTRIN[2007/19]
French:GOMME A MACHER RENFERMANT DE LA DEXTRINE NON-DIGESTIBLE.[2007/19]
Former [1994/28]KAUGUMMI UND ANDERE LEBENSMITTEL DIE UNVERDAULICHES DEXTRIN ENTHALTEN
Former [1994/28]CHEWING GUM AND OTHER COMESTIBLES CONTAINING INDIGESTIBLE DEXTRIN
Former [1994/28]GOMME A MACHER ET AUTRES DENREES COMESTIBLES RENFERMANT DE LA DEXTRINE INDIGESTE
Entry into regional phase11.02.1994National basic fee paid 
11.02.1994Search fee paid 
11.02.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
11.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/28]
19.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
30.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
30.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.1999Fee for grant paid
28.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000  27.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Racheli & C
V.les. M del Carso 4
20144 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2001/02]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000  27.10.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Racheli & C
V.les. M del Carso 4
20144 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Petruzziello, Aldo
Racheli & C. s.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.2000   
VP-SCHICKEDANZ AG
Schoppershofstrasse 80
D-90489 Nürnberg / DE
22.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.03.2002Date of oral proceedings
28.06.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.05.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.10.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.11.2006Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.04.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
06.07.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition08.08.2002Appeal received No.  T0840/02
04.11.2002Statement of grounds filed
07.12.2005Interlocutory revision of appeal
07.12.2005Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.09.2005Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2005Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:04.11.1994Request for further processing filed
04.11.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.12.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE01.05.2002
[2003/30]
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[YP]EP0487187
 [AP]EP0485304
 [A]EP0435656
 [AP]EP0477089
 [A]JP63299308B
 [A]JP63307194B
OppositionEP0368451
 JPH02276556
 US4631195
    - Helvetica Odontologica Acta, n° 1/1977, pp. 437-464,