Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0608297 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0608297



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 556
07.12.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 8
06.12.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
04.12.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.12.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.11.2004 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
02.11.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
29.10.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.10.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.10.2004 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
03.09.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.09.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.08.2004 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
18.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
17.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.08.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
11.08.2004 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
09.08.2004 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
06.08.2004 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
30.07.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.07.2004 Authorisation Appeal 1
28.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.07.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.07.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.07.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.06.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.06.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 9
02.06.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.04.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
19.02.2004 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.01.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
14.01.2004 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
20.06.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.06.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.06.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 13
07.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
06.06.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
16.04.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
08.04.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2002 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
13.03.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.02.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
31.01.2002 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
28.11.2001 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 3
23.11.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
21.11.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
16.11.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
12.11.2001 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
05.10.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
05.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
28.09.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.09.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.09.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
20.09.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
15.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.09.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.09.2001 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 2
04.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.09.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.09.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
28.08.2001 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
27.08.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.08.2001 Request for assignment Opposition 6
21.08.2001 Request for assignment Opposition 5
24.07.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.07.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.07.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2001 Request for assignment Opposition 1
13.07.2001 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
13.07.2001 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 3
13.07.2001 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
10.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.09.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
21.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.08.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.08.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
03.08.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
11.04.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.04.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.03.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.03.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.03.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.03.2000 N/A Opposition 1
01.03.2000 N/A Opposition 1
24.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
18.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Authorisation Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
15.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
14.02.2000 Authorisation Opposition 1
14.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.02.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
14.02.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
11.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.02.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
11.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
11.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
08.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
08.02.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
17.04.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.04.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
28.10.1998 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 2
21.09.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.09.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.09.1998 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
17.09.1998 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 11
26.08.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
15.04.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
30.03.1998 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
19.03.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.03.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.01.1998 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.10.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
14.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.06.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.05.1997 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
10.05.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
10.05.1997 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.05.1997 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
07.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.03.1997 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.02.1997 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Search / examination 2
22.11.1996 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
20.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
18.11.1996 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
19.07.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
19.07.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
04.06.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
02.04.1996 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 3
20.03.1996 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
15.03.1996 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 3
13.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 4
13.03.1996 Claims Search / examination 4
13.03.1996 Description Search / examination 2
13.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.03.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
16.01.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.01.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.08.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
22.06.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.06.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.06.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.04.1994 Annex Search / examination 5
16.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
16.04.1994 Description Search / examination 2
16.04.1994 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.01.1994 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
26.01.1994 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
26.01.1994 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
10.08.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
29.04.1993 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
29.04.1993 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20
29.04.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
29.04.1993 Priority document Search / examination 28
02.11.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1