blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0608359

EP0608359 - SOYBEAN PRODUCTS WITH IMPROVED CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITION AND SOYBEAN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  06.11.2009
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.11.2010  [2010/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [1994/31]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KERR, Phillip, S.
6 Woodsong Circle
Newark, DE 19714 / US
[1994/31]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]Jones, Elizabeth Louise, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2001/15]Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1994/31]Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date92922535.726.10.1992
[1994/31]
WO1992US08958
Priority number, dateUS1991078203324.10.1991         Original published format: US 782033
[1994/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9307742
Date:29.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0608359
Date:03.08.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0608359
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0608359
Date:09.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1993
ClassificationIPC:A01H5/10
[1994/31]
CPC:
A01H5/10 (EP,US); A01H6/542 (EP,US); A23J1/142 (EP);
A23K20/147 (EP); A23L11/07 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   IT [1994/31]
TitleGerman:SOJAPRODUKTE MIT VERBESSERTEM KOHLEHYDRATGEHALT UND SOJAPFLANZEN[1994/31]
English:SOYBEAN PRODUCTS WITH IMPROVED CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITION AND SOYBEAN PLANTS[1994/31]
French:PRODUITS DU SOYA AVEC COMPOSITION AMELIOREE EN HYDRATES DE CARBONE[1994/31]
Entry into regional phase13.04.1994National basic fee paid 
13.04.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
13.04.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.04.1994Examination requested  [1994/31]
11.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
08.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.1999Fee for grant paid
29.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.04.2000  11.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway
Decatur
Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/26]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.2000  11.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
4666 Faries Parkway
Decatur Illinois 62526 / US
Opponent's representative
VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
81634 München / DE
31.05.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.02.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.12.2003Date of oral proceedings
18.02.2004Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.02.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.09.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.07.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.10.2009Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition26.04.2004Appeal received No.  T0542/04
28.06.2004Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2007Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.09.2007Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:08.01.1997Request for further processing filed
08.01.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.01.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.11.2009
[2010/44]
Cited inInternational search[X]  - YASUI T, "DISSIMILARITY IN LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT CARBOHYDRATE COMPOSITION OF THE SEEDS OF CULTIVATED SOYBEAN ¬GLYCINE MAX (L.) MERRILL SUBSP. MAX3⁄4 AND WILD SOYBEAN¬G. MAX SUBSP. SOJA (SIEB. ET ZUCC.) OHASHI3⁄4", Agricultural and Biological Chemistry, Agricultural Chemical Society of Japan, JP, JP, (19850101), vol. 49, no. 04, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 933 - 937, XP002914381
 [Y]  - SNYDER H.E., KWON T W, "Soybean Utilization", SNYDER H.E., KWON T W, SNYDER H. E., KWON T. W., SOYBEAN UTILIZATION., US, NEW YORK, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD., (19870101), pages 58 - 59, 014606, XP002191359
 [X]  - HYMOWITZ T., ET AL., "RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN THE CONTENT OF OIL, PROTEIN, AND SUGAR IN SOYBEAN SEED.", AGRONOMSKI GLASNIK - AGRONOMY JOURNAL., ZAGREB., YU, YU, (19720901), vol. 64., ISSN 0002-1954, pages 613 - 616., XP002035319
 [X]  - JACORZYNSKI B, BARYLKO-PIKIELNA N, "QUANTITATIVE AND QUALITATIVE CHARACTERISTICS OF SUGARS IN THE SEEDS OF SOYBEAN CULTIVATED IN POLAND", ACTA AGROBOTANICA, PANSTWOWE WYDAWNICTWO NAUKOWE, WARSAW, PL, PL, (19830101), vol. 36, no. 01/02, ISSN 0065-0951, pages 41 - 48, XP008034396
 [X]  - HYMOWITZ T, ET AL., "STABILITY OF SUGAR CONTENT IN SOYBEAN STRAINS", COMMUNICATIONS IN SOIL SCIENCE AND PLANT ANALYSIS., MARCEL DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19720101), vol. 03, no. 05, ISSN 0010-3624, pages 367 - 373, XP008034397
 [A]  - POEHLMAN J M, "BREEDING SOYBEANS", POEHLMAN J M, POEHLMAN J. M., BREEDING FIELD CROPS., US, NEW YORK, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD., (19860101), pages 421 - 450, 018686, XP001173068
 [A]  - HILDEBRAND D. F., PHILLIPS G. C., COLLINS G. B., "II.1 SOYBEAN ÚGLYCINE MAX (L.) MERR.3⁄4.", BIOTECHNOLOGY IN AGRICULTURE AND FORESTRY., SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN., DE, DE, (19860101), vol. 02., ISSN 0934-943X, pages 283 - 308., XP000648050
OppositionUS4371556
 US4454804
 US5710365
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.