Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0612326

EP0612326 - CEREAL EXTRACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bestfoods
International Plaza, 700 Sylvan Avenue Englewood Cliffs
New Jersey 07632-9976 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
Bestfoods
International Plaza, 700 Sylvan Avenue
Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US
Former [1994/35]For all designated states
CPC INTERNATIONAL INC.
International Plaza P.O. Box 8000
Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GREENSHIELDS, Roderick, Norman
4 Beaconsfield Court
Sketty Swansea SA2 9JU / GB
02 / REES, Artis, Llywelyn
1 Brynawel
Pontardawe Swansea SA8 4JP / GB
[1994/35]
Representative(s)Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins
1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/35]Wilkinson, Stephen John
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date92923866.516.11.1992
[1994/35]
WO1992GB02122
Priority number, dateGB1991002442716.11.1991         Original published format: GB 9124427
GB1992000540612.03.1992         Original published format: GB 9205406
GB1992000909427.04.1992         Original published format: GB 9209094
GB1992001439207.07.1992         Original published format: GB 9214392
[1994/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9310157
Date:27.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0612326
Date:31.08.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993
[1994/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0612326
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:C08B37/14, D21C5/00
[1994/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/35]
TitleGerman:GETREIDE-EXTRAKTE[1994/35]
English:CEREAL EXTRACTS[1994/35]
French:EXTRAITS DE CEREALES[1994/35]
Entry into regional phase09.05.1994National basic fee paid 
09.05.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
09.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/35]
15.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.1999Fee for grant paid
02.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
19.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE16.02.2000
AT16.11.2000
DK16.11.2000
GB16.11.2000
LU16.11.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2003/45]SE16.02.2000
AT16.11.2000
DK16.11.2000
GB16.11.2000
Former [2002/29]SE16.02.2000
AT16.11.2000
GB16.11.2000
Former [2002/15]AT16.11.2000
GB16.11.2000
Former [2002/12]GB16.11.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0371493
 [Y]US4239906
 [Y]US4649113
 [A]US2801955
 [A]US2709699
 [A]  DATABASE WPIL Week 9007, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-048354