Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0613468

EP0613468 - Substituted salicylic acids for the treatment of autoimmune diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/36]NOVEL SUBSTITUTED SALICYCLIC ACIDS
[1999/21]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pharmacia & Upjohn Aktiebolag
112 87 Stockholm / SE
[1996/50]
Former [1994/49]For all designated states
Pharmacia AB
S-171 97 Stockholm / SE
Former [1994/44]For all designated states
PHARMACIA AKTIEBOLAG
S-751 82 Uppsala / SE
Former [1994/36]For all designated states
KABI PHARMACIA AB
S-751 82 Uppsala / SE
Inventor(s)01 / AGBACK, Karl, Hubert
Trallbovägen 5
S-755 90 Uppsala / SE
02 / AHRGREN, Leif
Vinkelvägen 6
S-740 60 Örbyhus / SE
03 / BERGLINDH, Thomas
Ripvägen 5
S-756 53 Uppsala / SE
04 / HARALDSSON, Martin
Kragstalundsvägen 163
S-186 51 Vallentuna / SE
05 / OLSSON, Lars-Inge
Kämpevägen 47
S-151 54 Södertälje / SE
06 / SMEDEGARD, Göran
Oslogatan 30
S-752 64 Uppsala / SE
[1994/36]
Representative(s)Widén, Björn , et al
Pharmacia & Upjohn AB
Patent Department
112 87 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1999/46]Widén, Björn , et al
Pharmacia & Upjohn AB Patent Department
112 87 Stockholm / SE
Former [1994/44]Widén, Björn , et al
Pharmacia AB
S-751 82 Uppsala / SE
Application number, filing date92924067.904.11.1992
[1994/36]
WO1992SE00758
Priority number, dateSE1991000339718.11.1991         Original published format: SE 9103397
[1994/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9310094
Date:27.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0613468
Date:07.09.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993
[1994/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0613468
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE27.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/75, C07D261/16, C07D239/42, C07D237/20, C07D277/82
[1994/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/36]
TitleGerman:Substituierte Salizylsäure zur Behandlung von Autoimmunkrankheiten[1999/21]
English:Substituted salicylic acids for the treatment of autoimmune diseases[1999/21]
French:Acides salicyliques substitues pour le traitement des maladies auto-immunes[1999/21]
Former [1994/36]NEUE SUBSTITUIERTE SALIZYLSÄURE
Former [1994/36]NOVEL SUBSTITUTED SALICYCLIC ACIDS
Former [1994/36]NOUVEAUX ACIDES SALICYLIQUES SUBSTITUES
Entry into regional phase07.06.1994National basic fee paid 
07.06.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
07.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/36]
30.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US2396145
 [A]US3915951
Examination   - BUDAVARI, S. 'The Merck Index - 11th edition', 1989, MERCK & CO., INC., USA * page 1411 - page 1412 *