Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0570597

EP0570597 - FLASH MEMORY IMPROVED IN ERASING CHARACTERISTIC, AND CIRCUIT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2002
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.03.2002  [2002/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/47]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / AKAOGI, Takao Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
02 / KAWASHIMA, Hiromi Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
03 / TAKEGUCHI, Tetsuji Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
04 / HAGIWARA, Ryoji Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
05 / KASA, Yasushi Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
06 / ITANO, Kiyoshi Fujitsu Limited 1015, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
07 / OGAWA, Yasushige Fujitsu VLSI Limited
1844-2, Kozojicho 2-chome
Kasugai-shi Aichi 487 / JP
08 / KAWAMURA, Shouichi Fujitsu Limited
1015, Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1993/47]
Representative(s)Fane, Christopher Robin King
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/47]Fane, Christopher Robin King
HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London, WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date92924898.709.12.1992
[1993/47]
WO1992JP01608
Priority number, dateJP1991032470109.12.1991         Original published format: JP 32470191
JP1991034657127.12.1991         Original published format: JP 34657191
JP1992000467814.01.1992         Original published format: JP 467892
JP1992006414319.03.1992         Original published format: JP 6414392
JP1992014530005.06.1992         Original published format: JP 14530092
JP1992015495815.06.1992         Original published format: JP 15495892
JP1992025659425.09.1992         Original published format: JP 25659492
JP1992029998710.11.1992         Original published format: JP 29998792
[1993/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9312525
Date:24.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0570597
Date:24.11.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993
[1993/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0570597
Date:21.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.06.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/06, H03K19/21, G11C5/14
[1998/46]
Former International [1993/47]G11C16/06, H03K19/21
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/47]
TitleGerman:FLASH-SPEICHER MIT VERBESSERTEN LÖSCHEIGENSCHAFTEN UND SCHALTUNG DAFÜR[1993/47]
English:FLASH MEMORY IMPROVED IN ERASING CHARACTERISTIC, AND CIRCUIT THEREFOR[1993/47]
French:MEMOIRE FLASH AUX CARACTERISTIQUES D'EFFACEMENT AMELIOREES ET CIRCUIT POUR UNE TELLE MEMOIRE[1993/47]
Entry into regional phase09.08.1993Translation filed 
02.09.1993National basic fee paid 
02.09.1993Search fee paid 
02.09.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1993Examination requested  [1993/47]
28.10.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2000Fee for grant paid
18.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01117838.1  / EP1168365
EP01121238.8  / EP1168362
EP99110956.2  / EP0944094
EP99114223.3  / EP0954102
EP99115179.6  / EP0961289
EP99115180.4  / EP0961290
Opposition(s)22.12.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH01273296  ;
 [PX]JPH0426995  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [PX] 1,2;
 []US5544117  (NAKAYAMA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 45 * * column 9, line 27 - column 10, line 16; figure 7 *;
 [PA]JPH04159696  ;
 [Y]EP0320916  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 46,48 * page 5, line 41 - page 6, line 8; figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US5022001  (KOWALSKI JACEK [FR], et al) [Y] 46,48 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 50; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US4601020  (ARAKAWA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 50 * column 1, line 42 - column 3, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4511811  (GUPTA ANIL [US]) [A] 47 * column 5, lines 15-43; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0453812  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 18 * page 1, line 46 - page 2, line 7; figures 1,2; table 1 *;
 [PA]US5077691  (HADDAD SAMEER S [US], et al) [PA] 4-7,18-23,65-68 * column 6, line 20 - column 9, line 16; figures 1-3; table 1 *;
 [E]US5392253  (ATSUMI SHIGERU [JP], et al) [E] 18 * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 52; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]EP0209912  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 15 * page 19, line 11 - page 21, line 15; table 1 * [A] 4,5,65,66;
 [Y]EP0182198  (EXEL MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 15 * page 11, lines 9-21; figure 5D *;
 [A]EP0352111  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5,7,66,68 * column 3, lines 28-45 * * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0405140  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 6,7,67,68 * page 7, lines 4-18; figure 6 *;
 [A]US4360744  (TAYLOR BRIAN E) [A] 18 * abstract * * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 5; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4460835  (MASUOKA FUJIO [JP]) [A] 10-12 * column 1, lines 5-65; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]DE3811151  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 60-63 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS57124942  ;
 [A]US4823318  (D ARRIGO SEBASTIANO [US], et al) [A] 18-45 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US5157280  (SCHRECK JOHN F [US], et al) [PA] 51 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 20; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]US4797899  (FULLER ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 29 * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 56; figure 2 *;
 [PXA]US5157281  (SANTIN GIOVANNI [US], et al) [PX] 24,26 * column 4, line 51 - column 7, line 2; figure 3 * [PA] 25,29
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900125), vol. 014, no. 040, Database accession no. (P - 0995), [X] 1 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920921), vol. 016, no. 454, Database accession no. (P - 1425), [PA] 3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821106), vol. 006, no. 222, Database accession no. (E - 140), [A] 64 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH03203097
 [A]JPH01273357
 [X]JPS61186019
 [X]JPS60211699
 [A]JPS60229300
 [X]JPH0271499
 [X]JPS50140255
 [X]JPS49126249