Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0642668

EP0642668 - NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEIN FLUID ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATRITECH, INC.
330 Nevada Street
Newton, MA 02160 / US
[1998/24]
Former [1995/11]For all designated states
MATRITECH, INC.
763D Concord Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BEAUSANG, Lee, Anne
67 Priscilla Avenue
Norfolk, MA 02046 / US
02 / LIDGARD, Graham, P.
77 Kingsbury Street
Wellesley, MA 02141 / US
03 / MILLER, Thomas, E.
701 Oak Street
Franklin, MA 02038 / US
[1995/11]
Representative(s)Price, Vincent Andrew
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables
Massetts Road
Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]Price, Vincent Andrew
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Former [1995/11]Harvey, David Gareth
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Application number, filing date92925031.429.10.1992
[1995/11]
WO1992US09220
Priority number, dateUS1991078580431.10.1991         Original published format: US 785804
[1995/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9309437
Date:13.05.1993
[1993/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0642668
Date:15.03.1995
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993
[1995/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0642668
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68, G01N33/577
[1995/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1995/11]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG VON NUKLEÄREN MATRIXPROTEINEN IN FLÜSSIGKEITEN[1995/11]
English:NUCLEAR MATRIX PROTEIN FLUID ASSAY[1995/11]
French:ANALYSE DE PROTEINES MATRICIELLES NUCLEAIRES SOLUBLES DANS LES FLUIDES CORPORELS[1995/11]
Entry into regional phase12.05.1994National basic fee paid 
12.05.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
13.05.1994Examination requested  [1995/11]
27.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.1999Fee for grant paid
03.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH05.04.2000
GR05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
DK05.07.2000
SE05.07.2000
MC31.10.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]CH05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
DK05.07.2000
SE05.07.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/42]CH05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
SE05.07.2000
MC31.10.2000
Former [2002/02]CH05.04.2000
LI05.04.2000
SE05.07.2000
Former [2001/26]SE05.07.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8703910
 [A]WO8906697
 [A]  JOURNAL OF UROLOGY vol. 143, no. 4, April 1990, BALTIMORE MD US page 227A H. GETZENBERG AND DONALD S. COFFEY 'Tissue Specifity and Cell Death Are Associated with Specific Alterations in Nuclear Matrix Proteins'
 [A]  JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY vol. 115, no. 3, 1991, NEW YORK NY US page 314A T. E. MILLER ET AL. 'Release of Nuclear Matrix Proteins during Apoptotic Cell Death'
 [A]  PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA vol. 85, no. 1, January 1988, WASHINGTON US pages 121 - 125 EDWARD G. FEY AND SHELDON PENMAN 'Nuclear Matrix Proteins Reflect Cell Type of Origin in Cultured Human Cells'