Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0614550

EP0614550 - SELF-PROGRAMMING MICROCONTROLLER WITH STORED INSTRUCTION TO COMMAND PROGRAM FROM EXTERNAL MEMORY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/37]SELF-PROGRAMMING MICROCONTROLLER WITH STORED INSTRUCTION TO COMMAND PROGRAM FROM EXTERNAL MEMORY
[1999/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROCHIP TECHNOLOGY INC.
2355 West Chandler Boulevard
Chandler, AZ 85224-6199 / US
[1994/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Chao-Wu
444 West Gila Springs, no. 1044
Chandler, AZ 85226 / US
02 / ROSENHAGEN, Kurt
485-33 S. Broadway
Hicksville, NY 11801 / US
03 / ITALIANO, Greg
485-33 S. Broadway
Hicksville, NY 11801 / US
04 / MITRA, Sumit
290 West Stacey Lane
Tempe, AZ 95048 / US
[1994/43]
Former [1994/37]01 / CHEN, Chao-Wu
868 S. Arizona Avenue, 1024
Chandler, AZ 85224 / US
02 / ROSENHAGEN, Kurt
485-33 S. Broadway
Hicksville, NY 11801 / US
03 / ITALIANO, Greg
485-33 S. Broadway
Hicksville, NY 11801 / US
04 / MITRA, Sumit
8860 S. Drea Lane
Tempe, AZ 85284 / US
Representative(s)Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre
Baker Botts 41 Lothbury
London EC2R 7HF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Patry, Didier Marcel Pierre
Baker Botts, L.L.P. 45 Ludgate Hill
London EC4M 7JU / GB
Former [1998/46]Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20
81679 München / DE
Former [1995/28]Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
D-81669 München / DE
Former [1994/37]Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
D-81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date92925068.612.11.1992
[1994/37]
WO1992US09464
Priority number, dateUS1991079096112.11.1991         Original published format: US 790961
[1994/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9310492
Date:27.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0614550
Date:14.09.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993
[1994/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0614550
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.05.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/06, G06F12/02
[1994/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/37]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHER PROGRAMMIERUNGS-MIKROKONTROLLER MIT GESPEICHERTEM BEFEHL ZUR PROGRAMM-STEUERUNG VON EXTERNEM SPEICHER UND VERFAHREN[1999/12]
English:SELF-PROGRAMMING MICROCONTROLLER WITH STORED INSTRUCTION TO COMMAND PROGRAM FROM EXTERNAL MEMORY AND METHOD[1999/12]
French:MICROCONTROLEUR AUTOPROGRAMMABLE A INSTRUCTION MEMORISEE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN PROGRAMME A PARTIR D'UNE MEMOIRE EXTERNE ET METHODE[1999/12]
Former [1994/37]AUTOMATISCHER PROGRAMMIERUNGS-MIKROKONTROLLER MIT GESPEICHERTEM BEFEHL ZUR PROGRAMM-STEUERUNG VON EXTERNEM SPEICHER
Former [1994/37]SELF-PROGRAMMING MICROCONTROLLER WITH STORED INSTRUCTION TO COMMAND PROGRAM FROM EXTERNAL MEMORY
Former [1994/37]MICROCONTROLEUR AUTOPROGRAMMABLE A INSTRUCTION MEMORISEE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN PROGRAMME A PARTIR D'UNE MEMOIRE EXTERNE
Entry into regional phase09.06.1994National basic fee paid 
09.06.1994Search fee paid 
09.06.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
09.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/37]
27.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.02.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.1999Fee for grant paid
23.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Request for further processing for:14.04.1998Request for further processing filed
14.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.05.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4777355  (TAKAHIRA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 8; column 6, lines 34-38 * [A] 4,6,7;
 [XA]US4204252  (HITZ GEORGE E [US], et al) [X] 5 * column 2, lines 3-17; column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 26; column 11, line 47 - column 14, line 44 * [A] 1,4,6,7;
 [A]DE3635754  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4-7 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 41; column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 56 *
 [A]  "Circuitry for a self-programming OTP-EPROM based microcontroller system", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, HAVANT GB, (198912), vol. 308, no. 68, pages 9531 - 9532, [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4171536
 [Y]US4205374
 [Y]US3940744
 [Y]US5063383
 [Y]US3827030
 [Y]US4642763
 [Y]US4914575