Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0551858

EP0551858 - Duobinary to binary decoder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.03.2001
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.04.2001 [2001/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-Dong
Kwonsun-Gu
Suwon City, Kyounggi-Do 441-370 / KR
[N/P]
Former [1993/29]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-Dong, Kwonsun-Gu
Suwon-City, Kyounggi-Do 441-370 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cho, Hyun Duk
Kwonsun Apt. 63-505, Kwonsun-Dong, Kwonsun-Gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-Do / KR
[1993/29]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93100299.211.01.1993
[1993/29]
Priority number, dateKR1950000039215.01.1992         Original published format: KR 50392
[1993/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0551858
Date:21.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0551858
Date:22.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0551858
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/00, H03K5/08, G01R19/165, H04L25/49
[1993/50]
Former International [1993/29]H04N7/00, H03K5/08, G01R19/165
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/29]
TitleGerman:Duobinär/binär Dekoder[1993/29]
English:Duobinary to binary decoder[1993/29]
French:Décodeur duobinaire/binaire[1993/29]
Examination procedure21.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/33]
23.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.1999Fee for grant paid
01.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0339727  (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al);
 [Y]GB1155576  (FELTEN & GUILLEAME FERNMELDEAN [DE]);
 [A]US4007382  (WARBERG JOHN MARTIN)