Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0555671

EP0555671 - Mirror with dazzle light attenuation zone [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.1996Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.1996 [1996/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RELIANT LASER CORPORATION
1175 F Chess Drive
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
[1993/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Black, Michael
560, Trinidad Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
02 / Kupershmidt, Vladimir
3124 Weymouth Ct.
Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US
[1993/40]
Former [1993/33]01 / Black, Michael
560, Trinidad Lane
Foster City, CA 94404 / US
02 / Kupershmidt, Vladimir
39869 Fremont Blvd., NO.1105
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[1996/16]
Former [1993/33]Strobel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Wallinger, Kroher & Partner Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date93100953.422.01.1993
[1993/33]
Priority number, dateUS1992083301010.02.1992         Original published format: US 833010
[1993/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0555671
Date:18.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/04, G02F1/13
[1993/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1993/33]
TitleGerman:Spiegel mit Abschwächungsbereich für blendedes Licht[1993/33]
English:Mirror with dazzle light attenuation zone[1993/33]
French:Miroir avec zone d'atténuation pour lumière d'éblouissement[1993/33]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure18.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/16]
31.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.12.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/23]
10.01.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1996/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199604   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2233828  ;
 [A]EP0144053  ;
 [A]US5073012  ;
 [AD]US4729638  ;
 [AD]US4786145  ;
 [AD]US4848878  ;
 [AD]US4671617  ;
 [AD]US4721364  ;
 [AD]US4799768  ;
 [AD]US4443057