Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0557787

EP0557787 - Imidazolylphenol derivatives, medicaments containing them and a process for the preparation of these compounds and medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
52078 Aachen / DE
[2000/21]
Former [1993/35]For all designated states
Grünenthal GmbH
Zieglerstrasse 6
D-52078 Aachen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ammann, Joachim, Dr.
Zehntweg 68
W-5100 Aachen / DE
02 / Haurand, Michael, Dr.
Auf der Geiss 40
W-5190 Stolberg / DE
03 / Geist, Cornelia, Dr.
Adalbertsteinweg 239
W-5100 Aachen / DE
04 / Englberger, Werner, Dr.
Rudolfstrasse 15
W-5190 Stolberg / DE
05 / Zimmer, Oswald, Dr.
Talblick 39
W-5102 Würselen / DE
[1993/35]
Application number, filing date93101999.609.02.1993
[1993/35]
Priority number, dateDE1992420468617.02.1992         Original published format: DE 4204686
[1993/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0557787
Date:01.09.1993
Language:DE
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0557787
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:C07D233/60, A61K31/415
[1993/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/35]
TitleGerman:Imidazolylphenolderivate, diese enthaltende Arzneimittel sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Verbindungen und Arzneimittel[1993/35]
English:Imidazolylphenol derivatives, medicaments containing them and a process for the preparation of these compounds and medicaments[1993/35]
French:Dérivés d'imidazolylphénol, médicaments les contenant et un procédé de préparation de ces composés et médicaments[1993/35]
Examination procedure09.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.11.1999Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
03.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2000Fee for grant paid
24.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Request for further processing for:17.11.1999Request for further processing filed
17.11.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.12.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0384594  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]);
 [A]EP0452908  (ABBOTT LAB [US]);
 [A]FR2444031  (PFIZER [PA]);
 [AD]EP0292699  (ABBOTT LAB [US]);
 [AD]WO9012008  (ABBOTT LAB [US]);
 [A]EP0232954  (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US])