blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0558002 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0558002



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 221
25.02.1993 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
25.02.1993 Priority document Search / examination 22
25.02.1993 Priority document Search / examination 23
25.02.1993 Drawings Search / examination 5
25.02.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.02.1993 Description Search / examination 15
25.02.1993 Claims Search / examination 3
25.02.1993 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.04.1993 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
28.04.1993 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 20
17.05.1993 Translation of priority document Search / examination 16
17.05.1993 Translation of priority document Search / examination 14
17.05.1993 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.06.1993 European search report Search / examination 3
29.06.1993 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1993 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
28.05.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.10.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.10.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.12.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.12.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.01.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.01.1997 Description Search / examination 15
07.01.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
03.10.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.02.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.02.1998 Description Search / examination 15
13.02.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
12.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
17.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
12.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.08.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
22.11.1999 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
22.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1