blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0558002


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
03.03.2000 Renewal fee
01.12.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
04.03.1999 Renewal fee
05.03.1998 Renewal fee
20.02.1998 Examination report or reply
01.10.1997 Examination report or reply
07.03.1997 Renewal fee
21.01.1997 Examination report or reply
17.12.1996 Examination report or reply
18.10.1996 Examination report or reply
24.05.1996 First examination report
23.05.1996 Examination report or reply
08.03.1996 Renewal fee
16.07.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.09.1993 [1993/35]
16.07.1993 Request for examination filed published on  01.09.1993 [1993/35]