blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0558002
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH05280368Global Dossier 26.10.1993A
Priority number Date
JP10586892 31.03.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH05231168Global Dossier 07.09.1993A
Priority number Date
JP3945792 26.02.1992
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0558002Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0558002 01.09.1993A1
Priority number Date
JP3945792 26.02.1992
JP10586892 31.03.1992
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69328453D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP3945792 26.02.1992
JP10586892 31.03.1992
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69328453T 07.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP3945792 26.02.1992
JP10586892 31.03.1992
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5361744 08.11.1994A
Priority number Date
JP3945792 26.02.1992
JP10586892 31.03.1992