Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0558002

EP0558002 - Supercharging device for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOCHIGIFUJISANGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2388 Ohmiya-machi Tochigi-shi
Tochigi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]For all designated states
TOCHIGIFUJISANGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2388 Ohmiya-machi
Tochigi-shi Tochigi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Teraoka, Masao, c/o TOCHIGIFUJISANGYO K.K.
2388 Ohmiya-machi
Tochigi-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
[1993/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93102974.825.02.1993
[1993/35]
Priority number, dateJP1992003945726.02.1992         Original published format: JP 3945792
JP1992010586831.03.1992         Original published format: JP 10586892
[1993/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0558002
Date:01.09.1993
Language:EN
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0558002
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:F02B39/04
[1993/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/35]
TitleGerman:Aufladevorrichtung für einen Verbrennungsmotor[1993/35]
English:Supercharging device for an internal combustion engine[1993/35]
French:Dispositif de suralimentation pour un moteur à combustion interne[1993/35]
Examination procedure25.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
28.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
07.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1999Fee for grant paid
22.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60209627  ;
 [X]FR2566082  (VALEO [FR]);
 [X]GB2230817  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]);
 [X]FR2614649  (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]);
 [A]DE3933409  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]);
 [A]US4174641  (HILLMAN DARREL D [US]);
 [A]FR2253954  (GHIELMETTI AG [CH]);
 [A]GB1034017  (RECH ETUDES PROD);
 [A]GB2220038  (WHELAN CHRISTOPHER DAVID);
 [A]GB2132711  (AISIN WARNER)
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 66 (M-461)(2123) 15 March 1986 & JP-A-60 209 627 ( JIDOSHA KIKI ) 22 October 1985,