Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0565115

EP0565115 - Input pen accommodation mechanism for tablet input apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1998
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.1999 [1999/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/41]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Tatsuo, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Otake, Kazuhiko, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1993/41]
Representative(s)Körber, Wolfhart , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/41]Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat. , et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09
D-80066 München / DE
Application number, filing date93105863.008.04.1993
[1993/41]
Priority number, dateJP1992011527409.04.1992         Original published format: JP 11527492
[1993/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0565115
Date:13.10.1993
Language:EN
[1993/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0565115
Date:19.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0565115
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06K11/18, G06F1/16
[1993/52]
Former International [1993/41]G06K11/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/41]
TitleGerman:Ablagemechanismus für den Eingabestift an einem Gerät mit einer Eingabefläche[1993/41]
English:Input pen accommodation mechanism for tablet input apparatus[1993/41]
French:Mécanisme d'un logement d'un crayon d'entrée de données pour un appareil du type tablette[1993/41]
Examination procedure21.06.1994Examination requested  [1994/34]
10.04.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1997Fee for grant paid
29.09.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0435511  ;
 [A]EP0419177  ;
 [A]US4927986  ;
 [A]WO9117493