Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0570749

EP0570749 - Circuit arrangement for transmission of telecommunication signals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1993/47]For all designated states
KE KOMMUNIKATIONS-ELEKTRONIK GMBH & CO
Kabelkamp 20
D-30179 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Still, Michael
Kastanienallee 4
W-3012 Langenhagen / DE
02 / Fritz, Wolfgang
Treitschkestrasse 5
W-3000 Hannover 1 / DE
03 / Niehoff, Jörg
Hans-Sachs-Weg 20A
W-3000 Hannover 81 / DE
04 / Bratschke, Thomas
Obentrautstrasse 68
W-3000 Hannover 21 / DE
[1993/47]
Representative(s)Döring, Roger , et al
Alcatel
Intellectual Property Department
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Döring, Roger , et al
Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Former [1999/33]Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Kabelkamp 20
30179 Hannover / DE
Former [1993/47]Döring, Roger, Dipl.-Ing.
Kabelkamp 20
D-30179 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date93107130.203.05.1993
[1993/47]
Priority number, dateDE1992421626616.05.1992         Original published format: DE 4216266
[1993/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0570749
Date:24.11.1993
Language:DE
[1993/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0570749
Date:26.11.1997
[1997/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0570749
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04Q3/62
[1993/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/47]
TitleGerman:Schaltungsanordnung zur Übertragung nachrichtentechnischer Signale[1993/47]
English:Circuit arrangement for transmission of telecommunication signals[1993/47]
French:Circuit de transmission de signaux de télécommunication[1993/47]
Examination procedure12.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/02]
01.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1999Fee for grant paid
13.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR05.01.2000
GB05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2004/07]GB05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2003/45]GB05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
PT05.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2003/07]GB05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/22]GB05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
BE31.05.2000
FR02.06.2000
Former [2001/09]GB05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
FR02.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5111497  (BLIVEN DAVID C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 29 * * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US4788680  (KIKUCHI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * column A * * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 27 * * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]  LUNIEWICZ M M ET AL, "THE SLC 96 SUBSCRIBER LOOP CARRIER SYSTEM: CHANNEL BANK", AT&T BELL LABORATORIES TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19841201), vol. 63, no. 10, pages 2283 - 2331, XP002008539