blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0570863

EP0570863 - Surveillance radar antenna in flat configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2000
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.2000 [2000/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
70547 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1993/47]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brunner, Anton, Dipl.-Ing.
Nussbaumstrasse 2A
W-8130 Starnberg / DE
02 / Kress, Erwin, Dipl.-Ing.
Fichtenstrasse 22
W-8031 Wörthsee / DE
[1993/47]
Application number, filing date93107897.614.05.1993
[1993/47]
Priority number, dateDE1992421709122.05.1992         Original published format: DE 4217091
[1993/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0570863
Date:24.11.1993
Language:DE
[1993/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0570863
Date:13.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0570863
Date:14.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.1994
ClassificationIPC:H01Q21/24, H01Q21/06, H01Q13/02, H01Q21/28
[1993/47]
CPC:
H01Q21/064 (EP); H01Q13/0258 (EP); H01Q21/245 (EP);
H01Q21/28 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/47]
TitleGerman:Rundsuchradarantenne in Flachbauweise[1993/47]
English:Surveillance radar antenna in flat configuration[1993/47]
French:Antenne de radar de surveillance à configuration plate[1993/47]
Examination procedure06.10.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
06.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.10.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1998Fee for grant paid
04.11.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
20.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0543509  (ELECTROMAGNETIC SCIENCES INC [US]) [E] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO8909501  (FORTEL TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1,6-8,12-15 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 16; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0470786  (GOULD HARRY J [US]) [Y] 1,6-8,12-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS5443659  ;
 [A]DE3915048  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0024808  (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [A] 16-19 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19790607), vol. 3, no. 66, Database accession no. (E - 115), & JP54043659 A 00000000 (BOEICHO GIJUTSU KENKYU HONBU) [A] 1-3 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.