Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0571913

EP0571913 - Method and system for target image acquisition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/48]Method and system for transformed target image acquisition
[1999/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2000
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2000 [2000/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC.
400 Perimeter Center, Terraces North
Atlanta, GA 30346 / US
[1993/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Skinger, Gregory P.
45 Winterwood Drive
Southbury, CT 06488 / US
[1993/48]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1993/48]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93108344.824.05.1993
[1993/48]
Priority number, dateUS1992088901926.05.1992         Original published format: US 889019
[1993/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0571913
Date:01.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0571913
Date:23.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0571913
Date:04.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10, G06K7/14, G06K19/06
[1994/04]
Former International [1993/48]G06K7/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1993/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Zielbilderkennung[1999/04]
English:Method and system for target image acquisition[1999/04]
French:Méthode et système pour l'acquisition d'une image[1999/04]
Former [1993/48]Verfahren und System zur zieltransformierten Bildaufbereitung
Former [1993/48]Method and system for transformed target image acquisition
Former [1993/48]Méthode et système pour transformer l'acquisition d'une image
Examination procedure13.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/45]
01.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
02.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.1999Fee for grant paid
03.03.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.05.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
28.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5039847  ;
 [AD]US4896029  ;
 [AD]US4874936  ;
 [APD]WO9301566  ;
 [A]US4826285