Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0572027

EP0572027 - Semiconductor memory device with spare columns [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/48]Semiconductor memory device
[1999/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1993/48]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kuwagata, Masaaki
2-18, Namiki 4-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Watanabe, Yuji
917,Shanboru Kawasaki Isago,2-8-1 Isago
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1993/48]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1993/48]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date93108668.028.05.1993
[1993/48]
Priority number, dateJP1992013881429.05.1992         Original published format: JP 13881492
[1993/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0572027
Date:01.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0572027
Date:04.02.1998
[1998/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0572027
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/20
[1993/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/48]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterspeichergerät mit Ersatzspalten[1999/41]
English:Semiconductor memory device with spare columns[1999/41]
French:Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur avec des colonnes de réserve[1999/41]
Former [1993/48]Halbleiterspeichergerät
Former [1993/48]Semiconductor memory device
Former [1993/48]Dispositif de mémoire à semi-conducteur
Examination procedure28.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/48]
08.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2000Fee for grant paid
02.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
11.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
12.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2165378  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 118; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US4811298  (HELWIG KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,13 * column W *;
 [X]US4849938  (FURUTANI KIYOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,7-10 * the whole document *