Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0578169

EP0578169 - Color photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/02]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Asami, Masahiro
c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210 Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1994/02]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/02]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93110722.105.07.1993
[1994/02]
Priority number, dateJP1992020020606.07.1992         Original published format: JP 20020692
[1994/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0578169
Date:12.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0578169
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/392, G03C1/79
[1994/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/02]
TitleGerman:Farbphotographisches Material[1994/02]
English:Color photographic material[1994/02]
French:Matériau photographique couleur[1994/02]
Examination procedure04.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/35]
09.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
29.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]NL19.01.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR16.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH01262538  ;
 [Y]EP0388908  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]);
 [Y]US4584266  (HIROSE TAKESHI [JP], et al)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900112), vol. 014, no. 015, Database accession no. (P - 989)<3958> ,