EP0585582 - Device for stimulating living tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [1998/11] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neubauer, Heinz Lädersättravägen 39 S-175 70 Järfälla / SE | 02 /
Hirschberg, Jakub Aprilvägen 3 S-183 44 Täby / SE | 03 /
Strandberg, Hans Landsvägen 51 S-172 36 Sundbyberg / SE | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93111476.3 | 16.07.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | SE19920002521 | 02.09.1992 Original published format: SE 9202521 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585582 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585582 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
A61N1/36185 (EP,US);
A61N1/365 (EP,US);
A61N1/3686 (EP,US);
A61N1/372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Stimulation lebenden Gewebes | [1994/10] | English: | Device for stimulating living tissue | [1994/10] | French: | Dispositif pour stimuler du tissu viviant | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 09.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.06.1998 | [1998/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4579119 (CALLAGHAN FRANK J [US]); | [A]US42898134 ; | [A]US4877032 (HEINZE ROLAND [DE], et al); | [A]US4628934 (POHNDORF PETER J [US], et al) | Examination | US4289134 |