blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581162

EP0581162 - Supporting chain replacement with spring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.1997
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.09.1997 [1997/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W. L. Gore & Associates GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/39]For all designated states
W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES GmbH
Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH
Postfach 1147
D-85636 Putzbrunn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haiduk, Herbert
Am Einsiedel 24a
D-91785 Pleinfeld / DE
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
D-80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date93111562.019.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateDE19920010074U27.07.1992         Original published format: DE 9210074 U
[1994/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0581162
Date:02.02.1994
Language:DE
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581162
Date:02.10.1996
Language:DE
[1996/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1993
ClassificationIPC:F16L3/01, H02G11/00
[1994/05]
CPC:
F16L3/015 (EP); H02G11/006 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Schleppkettenersatz mit Feder[1994/05]
English:Supporting chain replacement with spring[1994/05]
French:Remplacement pour chaînes de guidage avec ressort[1994/05]
Examination procedure04.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/35]
10.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.02.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.1996Fee for grant paid
08.05.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1397575  (GILBARCO LTD);
 [A]EP0096091  (PEINER MASCH SCHRAUBEN [DE]);
 [A]GB2014268  (KABELSCHLEPP GMBH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.