blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581200

EP0581200 - Silver halide photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.1997
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.1997Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.10.1997 [1997/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishikawa, Sadayasu, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kasai, Shigetami, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Honda, Yasuo, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
102 Hosoyama Furorie,751 Shinmaruko-machi Nakahara
-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 211 / JP
[1994/12]
Former [1994/05]01 / Ishikawa, Sadayasu, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kasai, Shigetami, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Honda, Yasuo, c/o KONICA CORPORATION
1 Sakura-machi
Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date93111774.122.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateJP1992019716823.07.1992         Original published format: JP 19716892
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0581200
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0581200
Date:07.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1994
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/035, G03C1/015
[1994/05]
CPC:
G03C1/015 (EP,US); G03C1/035 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Photographisches lichtempfindliches Silberhalogenidmaterial[1994/05]
English:Silver halide photographic light-sensitive material[1994/05]
French:Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent sensible à la lumière[1994/05]
Examination procedure29.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/30]
08.08.1997Application withdrawn by applicant  [1997/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0330508  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * page 4, line 38 - line 39 * * page 4, line 65 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, line 11 - line 20 * * page 9; table 1 * * claims 1,17 *;
 [Y]US5068173  (TAKEHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 22 * * column 5, line 39 - line 45 * * column 6, line 9 - line 12 * * column 11, line 51 - line 58 ** column 12, line 16 - line 18 *
 [Y]  - R. JAGANNATHAN ET AL., "Interparticle Effect on Crystal Growth-AgBr System", PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING, WASHINGTON US, (198203), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 61 - 64 [Y] 1-8 * page 61, column R, line 48 * * page 62, column L, line 5 - line 7 * * page 62, column R; table I *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.