blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0581216

EP0581216 - Process for producing coating films of titanium oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/05]Process for producing particles and coating films of titanium oxide
[1997/02]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  30.07.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD.
3-15, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku
Osaka 550-0002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD.
3-15, Edobori 1-chome
Nishi-ku, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okada, Mizuho, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho
ISHIHARA SANGYO K.K., 3-1, Nishishibukawa-2-chome
Kusatsu-shi / JP
02 / Tomonari, Masanori, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho
ISHIHARA SANGYO K.K., 3-1, Nishishibukawa-2-chome
Kusatsu-shi / JP
03 / Hirota, Tomoyuki, c/o Chuo Kenkyusho
ISHIHARA SANGYO K.K., 3-1, Nishishibukawa-2-chome
Kusatsu-shi / JP
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/05]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner
Möhlstrasse 37
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date93111854.123.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateJP1992022067728.07.1992         Original published format: JP 22067792
JP1992035571618.12.1992         Original published format: JP 35571692
JP1992035621221.12.1992         Original published format: JP 35621292
JP1993004587210.02.1993         Original published format: JP 4587293
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0581216
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581216
Date:08.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1993
ClassificationIPC:C03C17/25, C01G23/053
[1994/05]
CPC:
C01G23/047 (EP); C30B29/32 (KR); B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01G23/0532 (EP); C03C17/23 (EP); C03C17/256 (EP);
C30B11/02 (KR); C01P2004/02 (EP); C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/38 (EP); C01P2004/64 (EP); C03C2217/212 (EP);
C03C2217/71 (EP); C03C2218/11 (EP); C03C2218/17 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/46]
Former [1994/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Überzugfilmen aus Titanoxyd[1997/02]
English:Process for producing coating films of titanium oxide[1997/02]
French:Procédé de préparation de films de revêtement d'oxyde de titane[1997/02]
Former [1994/05]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Teilchen und Überzugfilmen aus Titanoxyd
Former [1994/05]Process for producing particles and coating films of titanium oxide
Former [1994/05]Procédé de préparation de particules et de films de revêtement d'oxyde de titane
MiscellaneousEPB 1995/38: Teilanmeldung 95111338.0 eingereicht am 19/07/95
EPB 1995/38: Divisional application 95111338.0 filed on 19/07/95
EPB 1995/38: Demande divisionnaire 95111338.0 déposée le 19/07/95
Examination procedure27.01.1994Examination requested  [1994/13]
19.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
10.06.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.1996Fee for grant paid
18.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP95111338.0  / EP0675086
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.10.1997  19.11.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne
DPR - CM Ecublens
1015 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Ganguillet, Cyril
ABREMA SA
Avenue du Théâtre 16
P.O. Box 5027
1002 Lausanne / CH
 [N/P]
Former [2009/29]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.1997  19.11.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne
DPR - CM Ecublens
1015 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Ganguillet, Cyril
ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027
1002 Lausanne / CH
Former [1997/49]
Opponent(s)01  07.10.1997   
Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne
DPR - CM Ecublens
1015 Lausanne / CH
Opponent's representative
Ganguillet, Cyril
ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065
1002 Lausanne / CH
24.11.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.01.1999Date of oral proceedings
20.04.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
30.04.1999Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2000/52]CH08.01.1997
LI08.01.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]JP61168528  ;
 [A]GB2018234  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.