Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0583658

EP0583658 - A method for improving bottom and water quality in water areas and a set of agents used in the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2001 [2001/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOCHEM INDUSTRIAL LTD.
4-1-803, 7-Chome, Takatsukadai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-22 / JP
[2000/08]
Former [1997/02]For all designated states
BIOCHEM INDUSTRIAL LTD.
4-1-803, 7-Chome, Takatsukadai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-22 / JP
Former [1994/08]For all designated states
BIOCHEM INDUSTRIAL LTD.
1111-20, Katayama-cho
Ono-shi, Hyogo 675-13 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iwai, Shigehisa
30, Kamimiyamae-cho Shishigatani, Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606 / JP
02 / Kobayashi, Michiharu
1-11, Baba-cho, Zyodoji Sakyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606 / JP
03 / Uchida, Chihiro
8-29-198, Asahigaoka
Tazimi-shi, Gifu 507 / JP
04 / Kuroda, Koji
c/o Biochem Industrial Ltd., 1111-20, Katayama-cho
Ono-shi, Hyogo 675-13 / JP
05 / Toda, Shigeru
c/o Biochem Industrial Ltd., 1111-20, Katayama-cho
Ono-shi, Hyogo 675-13 / JP
[1994/08]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date93112053.928.07.1993
[1994/08]
Priority number, dateJP1992024559620.08.1992         Original published format: JP 24559692
JP1993011621318.05.1993         Original published format: JP 11621393
[1994/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0583658
Date:23.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0583658
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:C02F11/00, C02F1/00, C02F3/28, C02F3/30, C02F3/34
[1994/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Boden- und Wasserqualität in einem Wassergebiet und in diesem Verfahren verwendeter Satz von Agentien[1994/08]
English:A method for improving bottom and water quality in water areas and a set of agents used in the method[1994/08]
French:Procédé pour améliorer la qualité de l'eau et du sol d'un bassin d'eau et un ensemble d'agents utilisés dans ce procédé[1994/08]
Examination procedure12.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/41]
27.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
10.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1999Fee for grant paid
13.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JP1271517  ;
 [A]US4895665  (COLELLI CAM C [US], et al);
 [A]EP0107204  (SYDKRAFT AB [SE])
 [A]  DATABASE WPI Section Ch, Week 4989, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A93, AN 89-361199 & JP-A-1 271 517 (TOA KENSETSU KOGYO) 30 January 1989,
Examination   Environmental Conservation Engineering: Vol. 17, No. 12, 30.12.88, pages 788-790; Vol. 18, No. 6, 30.06.89, pages 334-336; Vol. 19, No. 8, 30.08.90, pages 522-528.,
    Environmental Conservation Engineering: Vol. 18, No. 6, 30.06.89, pages 334-336,
    Environmental Conservation Engineering: Vol. 19, No. 8, 30.08.90, pages 522-528.,