Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0581286

EP0581286 - Camcorder with rotatable connected monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP
Former [1994/05]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tagaki, Minori
130-14, Nishimishima 6-chome , Nishinasuno-machi
Nasu-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP
02 / Aramaki, Kouji
No.610 174-21, Hayakawa-cho
Yaita-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
03 / Ikeda, Takeshi
Soko-ryo 243, 174-7 Hayakawa-cho
Yaita-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP
[1994/05]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1994/05]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date93112177.629.07.1993
[1994/05]
Priority number, dateJP1992020363830.07.1992         Original published format: JP 20363892
JP1992020371330.07.1992         Original published format: JP 20371392
[1994/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0581286
Date:02.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0581286
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/225, H01R35/04
[1994/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [1994/05]
TitleGerman:Camcorder mit drehbar verbundenem Monitor[1994/05]
English:Camcorder with rotatable connected monitor[1994/05]
French:Camescope avec moniteur rotatif intégré[1994/05]
Examination procedure14.04.1994Examination requested  [1994/23]
30.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.1999Fee for grant paid
06.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP61150474  ;
 [A]JP1106581  ;
 [A]JP1289379  ;
 [A]JP1018375  ;
 [Y]US4757388  ;
 [A]DE3918279  ;
 [A]US5043822  ;
 [A]US4262301  ;
 [A]EP0203783  ;
 [A]EP0444584
 [YD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 352 (E-458)27 November 1986 & JP-A-61 150 474 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) 9 July 1986, & JP61150474 A 19860709
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 348 (E-799)4 August 1989 & JP-A-1 106 581 ( CANON INC ) 24 April 1989, & JP1106581 A 19890424
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 073 (E-887)9 February 1990 & JP-A-1 289 379 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) 21 November 1989, & JP1289379 A 19891121
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 196 (E-755)10 May 1989 & JP-A-1 018 375 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ), & JP1018375 A 19890510