Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0638869

EP0638869 - Procedure for a high-resolution spectral analysis for multichannel observations [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.1996
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.05.1996 [1996/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/07]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haardt, Martin, Dipl.-Ing.
Avenariusstrasse 18
D-81243 München / DE
02 / Strobach, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Josef-Maria-Lutz-Anger 32
D-81737 München / DE
[1995/07]
Application number, filing date93113022.313.08.1993
[1995/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0638869
Date:15.02.1995
Language:DE
[1995/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0638869
Date:07.06.1995
Language:DE
[1995/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1994
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00
[1995/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1995/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur hochauflösenden Spektralanalyse bei mehrkanaligen Beobachtungen[1995/07]
English:Procedure for a high-resolution spectral analysis for multichannel observations[1995/07]
French:Procédé d'analyse spectrale à haute résolution pour oberservations à plusieurs canaux[1995/07]
Examination procedure17.06.1994Request for accelerated examination filed
20.06.1994Examination requested  [1995/07]
07.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.1994Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.1995Fee for grant paid
17.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22]
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - S.Y.KUNG ET AL, "A REALIZATION APPROACH TO SPECTRAL LINE ESTIMATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1983 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, IEEE PRESS NEW YORK US, BOMBAY AND NEW DELHI, INDIA, (19831229), vol. 1, pages 408 - 413 [X] 1-10 * page 410, column L, line 13 - column R, line 24 * * page 411, column R, line 14 - page 412, column R, line 28 * [Y] 11-16
 [DX]  - BHASKAR D. RAO ET AL, "MODEL BASED PROCESSING OF SIGNALS: A STATE SPACE APPROACH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK, US, (199202), vol. 80, no. 2, pages 283 - 309, XP000291184 [DX] 1-10 * page 289, column R, line 3 - page 290, column L, line 22 * * page 292, column R, line 1 - page 293, column L, line 3 * * page 294, column L, line 31 - page 296, column L, line 19 * * page 296, column R, line 13 - page 297, column L, line 25 * * page 299, column L, line 24 - page 301, column L, line 19 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.123298
 [Y]  - Z.DRSKA ET AL, "CARDIAC MICROPOTENTIALS REACHED FROM ONE SYSTOLE AS NONDIPOLAR RESIDUE BY SINGULAR VALUE DECOMPOSITION", PHYSIOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 73 - 76 [Y] 11-16 * page 74, column L, line 37 - column R, line 30 *
 [A]  - J.VANDEWALLE ET AL, "FILTERING OF VECTOR SIGNALS BASED ON THE SINGULAR VALUE DECOMPOSITION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1985 EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON CIRCUIT THEORY AND DESIGN, NORTH HOLLAND NL, PRAGUE, CZECHOSLOVAKIA, (19850902), pages 458 - 461 [A] 1-10 * page 459, column L, line 8 - line 53 * * page 459, column R, line 1 - line 30 *
 [A]  - J.VANDERSCHOOT ET AL, "EXTRACTION OF WEAK BIOELECTRICAL SIGNALS BY MEANS OF SINGULAR VALUE DECOMPOSITION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ANALYSIS AND OPTIMIZATION OF SYSTEMS, SPRINGER VERLAG, GERMANY, NICE, FRANCE, (19840619), vol. 2, pages 434 - 448 [A] 1-10 * page 436, line 27 - page 439, line 6 *
 [A]  - D.CALLAERTS, "SINGULAR VALUE DECOMPOSITION IN DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING", JOURNAL A, ANTWERPEN BE, (199106), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 11 - 16, XP000237329 [A] 1-16 * page 11, column R, line 37 - page 12, column L, line 10 * * page 13, column L, line 20 - page 14, column L, line 25 *