blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0584706

EP0584706 - Tool for portable handtools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.1999
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.12.1999 [1999/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/50]
Former [1994/09]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Blöchle, Hans
Acherweg 3
CH-6730 Stans / CH
02 / Wanner, Karl, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Moltkestrasse 10
D-70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
[1994/09]
Application number, filing date93113202.118.08.1993
[1994/09]
Priority number, dateDE1992422794922.08.1992         Original published format: DE 4227949
[1994/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0584706
Date:02.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0584706
Date:10.08.1994
Language:DE
[1994/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0584706
Date:09.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.1994
ClassificationIPC:B25D17/08
[1994/09]
CPC:
B25D17/088 (EP); B25D2217/0034 (EP); B25D2217/0042 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/09]
TitleGerman:Werkzeug für Handwerkzeugmaschinen[1994/09]
English:Tool for portable handtools[1994/09]
French:Outil pour outils à main[1994/09]
Examination procedure10.02.1995Examination requested  [1995/15]
07.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.05.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.1998Fee for grant paid
07.09.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8809245  (BOSCH) [Y] 1,2,6,7,9 * page 5, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [YP]EP0551795  (HILTI) [YP] 1,2,6,7,9 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2420021  (WESTA WERKZEUGBAU) [A] 1,9 * figure . *;
 [AD]EP0433876  (GEBR. HELLER) [AD] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [AP]EP0542683  (HILTI) [AP] 1,9 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.