EP0584718 - Switched signal processing circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albean, David Lawrence 6166 Norwaldo Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana / US | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1994/09] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93113245.0 | 19.08.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | US19920936682 | 28.08.1992 Original published format: US 936682 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584718 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584718 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00, H03G9/02 | [1994/09] | CPC: |
H03G7/002 (EP,US);
H04N5/607 (KR);
G10L21/038 (EP,US);
H03G9/025 (EP,US);
H04N5/455 (KR);
H04N5/52 (KR);
G10L19/008 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, PT [1994/09] | Title | German: | Anlage für Signalschaltung und -verarbeitung | [1994/09] | English: | Switched signal processing circuit | [1994/09] | French: | Circuit de commutation et de traitement de signaux | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.06.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00120209.2 / EP1083656 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14] | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 04.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.1999 | Decision despatched | 12.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 03.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 11.07.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2002/25] | PT | 11.07.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0369287 ; | [DA]US5091957 (ANDERSON MARK R [US], et al) [DA] 1-4 * column W * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910614), vol. 015, no. 233, Database accession no. (E - 1077), & JP03069287 A 19910325 (NEC IC MICROCOMPUT SYST LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | US3903470 |