Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0583787

EP0583787 - Silver halide photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Former [1994/08]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murayama, Masahiko
c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1994/08]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93113287.219.08.1993
[1994/08]
Priority number, dateJP1992022153820.08.1992         Original published format: JP 22153892
[1994/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0583787
Date:23.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0583787
Date:20.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0583787
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.08.1995
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/795, G03C1/91
[1994/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/05]
Former [1994/08]BE,  DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial[1994/08]
English:Silver halide photographic material[1994/08]
French:Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent[1994/08]
Examination procedure15.12.1995Examination requested  [1996/06]
21.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.1999Fee for grant paid
09.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.03.2000
NL22.03.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2003/08]NL22.03.2000
FR18.08.2000
Former [2001/16]FR18.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0279450  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 7 *;
 [E]US5238801  (ISHIGAKI KUNIO [JP], et al) [E] 1 * column 8 *;
 [X]JPH02110447  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1;
 [A]DE2816856  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0581120