Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0584753

EP0584753 - Process for preparing chlorogallium phthalocyanine crystals [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.
No. 3-5, Akasaka 3-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/09]For all designated states
FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.
No. 3-5, Akasaka 3-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nukada, Katsumi, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd.
Takematsu Works, 1600 Takematsu
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Imai, Akira, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd.
Takematsu Works, 1600 Takematsu
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / IIjima, Masakazu, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd.
Takematsu Works, 1600 Takematsu
Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1994/09]
Representative(s)Boeters, Hans Dietrich , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/09]Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date93113399.523.08.1993
[1994/09]
Priority number, dateJP1992024893326.08.1992         Original published format: JP 24893392
[1994/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0584753
Date:02.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0584753
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0584753
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:C09B47/067, C09B47/073, C09B67/50, C09B67/12, // G03G5/06
[1994/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1994/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Chlorogalliumphtalocyaninkristallen[2000/34]
English:Process for preparing chlorogallium phthalocyanine crystals[1994/09]
French:Procédé de préparation de cristaux de phtalocyanine de chlorogallium[1994/09]
Former [1994/09]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Chlorogalliumphtalocyaninenkristallen
Examination procedure08.09.1995Examination requested  [1995/45]
19.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2001Fee for grant paid
02.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
28.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
24.08.1995M01   Fee paid on   08.09.1995
Documents cited:Search[PA]GB2255569  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [DPA]JPH0598181  (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [DPA] 1-9;
 [DA]JPH01221459
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 41, Database accession no. 89-297884, & JPH01221459 A 19890904 (FUJI XEROX CO) [DA] 1-9 * abstract *