Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0586972

EP0586972 - Laryngoscope blade [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2000
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.04.2000 [2000/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Former [1998/51]For all designated states
Karl Storz GmbH & Co.
Mittelstrasse 8
78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Former [1994/11]For all designated states
Storz, Karl, Dr.med. h.c.
Auf dem Schildrain 39
D-78532 Tuttlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Storz, Karl, Dr. med. h.c.
verstorben / / DE
[1998/51]
Former [1994/11]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Weller, Wolfgang , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil
Patentanwälte
Rotebühlstrasse 121
70178 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]Weller, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat. , et al
Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121
D-70178 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date93113629.526.08.1993
[1994/11]
Priority number, dateDE1992422973905.09.1992         Original published format: DE 4229739
DE1992424379023.12.1992         Original published format: DE 4243790
[1994/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0586972
Date:16.03.1994
Language:DE
[1994/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0586972
Date:28.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/24, A61B13/00, A61B1/267
[1999/01]
Former International [1994/11]A61B1/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/11]
TitleGerman:Laryngoskopspatel[1994/11]
English:Laryngoscope blade[1994/11]
French:Spatule de laryngoscope[1994/11]
Examination procedure08.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/44]
24.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1997Observations by third parties
03.02.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.10.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.1999Fee for grant paid
27.01.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.01.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16]
Request for further processing for:09.04.1998Request for further processing filed
09.04.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.04.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0339541  (MUELLER GUSTAV GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 22 - line 54 * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 24 * * figures 1,2,5-7 * [A] 2,3,7;
 [XA]US5060633  (GIBSON MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1 * column W * [A] 2,3,7;
 [XA]EP0184588  (BAUMAN JACK) [X] 1 * page 5, line 33 - page 9, line 19 * * page 10, line 18 - page 11, line 36 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 2,3,7-9;
 [XA]DE8526662U  (HOLZHAUER & SUTTER MEDIZINISCH-TECHNISCHE GERÄTE & INSTRUMENTE GMBH) [X] 1 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 10 * * figure - * [A] 2,3,8;
 [XA]US4565187  (SOLOWAY DAVID J [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 44 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 5
otherUS4570614
 US4958624