Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0587096

EP0587096 - Camera equipped with data imprinting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2001 [2001/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1994/11]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Machida, Kiyosada
3-4-502,Oomaki
Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Soshi, Isao
2-7-14-303,Hatsudai
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Miyamoto, Hidenori
6-203,Hinode
Urayasu-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1994/12]
Former [1994/11]01 / Machida, Kiyosada
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Soshi, Isao
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Miyamoto, Hidenori
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Rauh, Helga
Merten & Pfeffer Patentverwaltung Allersberger Strasse 185
90461 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Rauh, Helga
Wielandstrasse 4
90419 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/06]Merten, Fritz
Tristanstrasse 5
90461 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/05](deleted)
...
Former [1994/11]Merten, Fritz
Tristanstrasse 5
D-90461 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date93114291.306.09.1993
[1994/11]
Priority number, dateJP1992026549808.09.1992         Original published format: JP 26549892
JP1992024358411.09.1992         Original published format: JP 24358492
[1994/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0587096
Date:16.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0587096
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/24
[1994/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1994/11]
TitleGerman:Kamera, die mit einer Vorrichtung zum Aufbelichten von Daten ausgestattet ist[1994/11]
English:Camera equipped with data imprinting device[1994/11]
French:Caméra ayant un dispositif d'impression photographique des données[1994/11]
Examination procedure13.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/45]
14.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1999Fee for grant paid
01.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP03025426  ;
 [A]JP04009023  ;
 [AD]JP02304538  ;
 [Y]US4101912  (WATANABE YOSHIAKI, et al)
 [Y]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 156 (P-1192)18 April 1991 & JP-A-03 025 426 ( SEIKO EPSON ) 4 February 1991,
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 159 (P-1339)17 April 1992 & JP-A-04 009 023 ( RICOH ) 13 January 1992,
 [AD]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 88 (P-1174)4 March 1991 & JP-A-02 304 538 ( CANON ) 18 December 1990,
ExaminationUS4994830
 DE3435309