Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0592808

EP0592808 - Commercial data masking [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/16]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Elander, Robert C.
3210 Church Road
Saugerties, N.Y. 12477 / US
02 / Holloway, Christopher J.
13 Wilders Close
Woking, Surrey GU21 3HA / GB
03 / Johnson, Donald B.
11635 Crystal Creek Lane
Manassas, VA 22111 / US
04 / Kelly, Michael J.
34 Pine Ridge Road
Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US
05 / Le, An V.
10227 Battlefield Drive
Manassas, VA 22110 / US
06 / Lubold, Paul G.
33 Denver Road
Kingston, NY 12401-1109 / US
07 / Matyas, Stephen M.
10298 Cedar Ridge Drive
Manassas, VA 22110 / US
08 / Randall, James D.
1237 Shaker Drive
Herndon, VA 22070 / US
09 / Wilkins, John D.
P.O. Box 8
Somerville, VA 22739 / US
[1994/16]
Representative(s)Jost, Ottokarl
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/16]Jost, Ottokarl, Dipl.-Ing.
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
D-70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date93114398.608.09.1993
[1994/16]
Priority number, dateUS1992096295116.10.1992         Original published format: US 962951
[1994/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0592808
Date:20.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0592808
Date:25.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0592808
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/06
[1994/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/16]
TitleGerman:Geschäftliche Datenmaskierung[1994/16]
English:Commercial data masking[1994/16]
French:Masquage de données commerciales[1994/16]
Examination procedure19.08.1994Examination requested  [1994/42]
01.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.1999Fee for grant paid
14.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4908861  (BRACHTL BRUNO O [DE], et al) [DA] 1,7,17,18 * column 8, line 17 - line 26 * * column 59 - column 64 * * column 9, line 54 - line 61 *;
 [A]WO8400457  (LIGHT SIGNATURES INC [US]) [A] 1,17,18 * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 3 *
 [A]  J.J. QUISQUATER, "THE IMPORTANCE OF "GOOD" KEY SCHEDULING SCHEMES (HOW TO MAKE A SECURE DES* SCHEME WITH KEYS OF 48 OR LESS BITS?)", PROCEEDINGS OF CRYPTO '85, NEW YORK, (19850818), pages 537 - 542, [A] 1,17,18 * page 538, line 1 - line 2 * * line 14 - page 539, line 6 *