Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0588290

EP0588290 - Camera with sight line detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.05.1999
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.07.1999 [1999/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-Ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sato, Shigemasa
8-15-205, Susukino 2-chome, Midori-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Watanabe, Toshimi
Nankoryo, 1011-2, Tsuiruma
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1994/12]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date93114700.313.09.1993
[1994/12]
Priority number, dateJP1992024519514.09.1992         Original published format: JP 24519592
[1994/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0588290
Date:23.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0588290
Date:18.05.1994
Language:EN
[1994/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.1994
ClassificationInternational:G03B13/02, G02B7/28, A61B3/113, G02B23/00
[1994/17]
Former International [1994/12]G03B13/02, G02B7/28, A61B3/113
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [1994/12]
TitleGerman:Kamera mit Blickrichtungserfassung[1994/12]
English:Camera with sight line detecting device[1994/12]
French:Caméra équipé d'un détecteur de la direction du regard[1994/12]
Examination procedure09.11.1994Examination requested  [1995/01]
17.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1999/27]
16.03.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1999/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04240438  ;
 [A]DE2824790  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-5,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO8902585  (UDDEN PER [CH]) [A] 1,2,4,7-10 * abstract *;
 [A]WO8102084  (EASTMAN TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 7 * figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0499320  (SODERN [FR], et al) [A] 9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930108), vol. 17, no. 11, Database accession no. (C - 1015), [A] 1-4,7-10 * abstract *