Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0593922

EP0593922 - Solid state imaging device having dual-H-CCD with a compound channel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/17]Solid state imaging device having dual-h-ccd with a compound channel
[1999/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/17]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Atsushi
Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1994/17]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E.
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1994/17]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date93115298.722.09.1993
[1994/17]
Priority number, dateJP1992027786722.09.1992         Original published format: JP 27786792
[1994/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0593922
Date:27.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0593922
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/148
[1994/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1994/17]
TitleGerman:Bildaufnahmevorrichtung mit Dual-H-CCD und Verbundkanal[1999/35]
English:Solid state imaging device having dual-H-CCD with a compound channel[1999/35]
French:Capteur d'images à l'état solide comportant un double H-CCD à canal composite[1994/17]
Former [1994/17]Eine doppelt H-CCD enthaltende Festkörper - Bildaufnahmevorrichtung mit gemischtem Kanal
Former [1994/17]Solid state imaging device having dual-h-ccd with a compound channel
Examination procedure27.09.1994Examination requested  [1994/48]
27.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199503   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.1996
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH0372790  ;
 [A]US4807037  (IESAKA MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *;
 [A]EP0383519  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910620), vol. 15, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 1079), [DA] 1-6 * abstract *